blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2565768

EP2565768 - Mobile terminal and method of operating a user interface therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.10.2021
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.11.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.07.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024  [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2013/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Kang, Jiyoung
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Kyunghwa
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Shin, Dongjun
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2020/52]
Former [2013/10]01 / Kang, Jiyoung
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Kyunghwa
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Shin, Dongjun
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2020/52]HGF
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
Former [2013/31]Gover, Richard Paul, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2013/10]Harrison Goddard Foote
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York
YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date12182042.728.08.2012
[2013/10]
Priority number, dateKR2011008706030.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110087060
[2013/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2565768
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2565768
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2565768
Date:23.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2017
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/0488
[2013/10]
CPC:
G06F3/04883 (EP,KR,US); G06F3/0416 (KR,US); G06F3/16 (KR);
H04M1/0266 (US); H04M1/724 (US); H04M2250/22 (KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/10]
TitleGerman:Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Benutzerschnittstelle darin[2013/10]
English:Mobile terminal and method of operating a user interface therein[2013/10]
French:Terminal mobile et procédé de fonctionnement d'une interface utilisateur dans celui-ci[2013/10]
Examination procedure28.08.2012Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/36]
25.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2020Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.07.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2020Fee for grant paid
13.11.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20216687.2  / EP3859505
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.03.2019
Opposition(s)24.09.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
21.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.08.2012
AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CY23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
MK23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE28.08.2021
LU28.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/29]HU28.08.2012
AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CY23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE28.08.2021
LU28.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2023/24]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CY23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE28.08.2021
LU28.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/35]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
IE28.08.2021
LU28.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/34]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
LU28.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/23]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
LU28.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/21]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/18]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
MC23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2022/13]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SI23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2022/10]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/51]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
ES23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/49]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
DK23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/48]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
IT23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/45]AL23.12.2020
AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/42]AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
IS23.04.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/39]AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
PL23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/37]AT23.12.2020
CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/36]CZ23.12.2020
EE23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/35]CZ23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RO23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SK23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/34]CZ23.12.2020
FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/33]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LT23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
PT23.04.2021
Former [2021/32]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
SM23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/28]FI23.12.2020
HR23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/24]FI23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
BG23.03.2021
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/23]FI23.12.2020
LV23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
SE23.12.2020
NO23.03.2021
GR24.03.2021
Former [2021/22]FI23.12.2020
RS23.12.2020
NO23.03.2021
Former [2021/20]FI23.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]US5463725  (HENCKEL JONATHAN D [US], et al) [A] 6,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008303786  (NAKAMURA HIROKI [JP], et al) [A] 5,13 * paragraph [0053]; figure 8 *;
 [A]WO2009109585  (SUPER SONIC IMAGINE [FR], et al) [A] 5,13* page 24, line 14 - page 24, line 19 *;
 [I]US2010020026  (BENKO HRVOJE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0058] * * figures 1,6 *;
 [A]US2011055773  (AGARAWALA ANAND [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044]; figures 3-5 *;
 [I]WO2011094936  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2010149090
 US2010238123
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.