Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2565449

EP2565449 - Method and apparatus for thermal monitoring the structural conditions of a wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.07.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolawind GmbH
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE
[2017/51]
Former [2017/49]For all designated states
Zell, Gabriele
Am Wambach 12, D
45481 Mülheim / DE
Former [2015/26]For all designated states
HGZ Patentvermarktungs GmbH
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mühlheim / DE
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
HGZ Patentvermarktungs GmbH
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mühlheim / DE
Former [2015/04]For all designated states
Zell, Gabriele
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mülheim / DE
Former [2014/15]For all designated states
Zell, Horst
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mülheim / DE
Former [2013/10]For all designated states
Zell, Horst
Düsseldorfer Strasse 171
45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zell, Horst
Am Wambach 12
45481 Mühlheim / DE
 [2015/04]
Former [2013/10]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Sparing Röhl Henseler
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2013/10]Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Platz der Ideen 2
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date12182635.831.08.2012
[2013/10]
Priority number, dateDE20111011178901.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011111789
DE20111011883318.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011118833
[2013/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2565449
Date:06.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2565449
Date:03.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2565449
Date:24.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:F03D11/00, G01N25/72
[2014/36]
Former International [2013/10]F03D11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2013/10]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur thermischen Überprüfung des Bauzustandes von Windkraftanlagen[2013/10]
English:Method and apparatus for thermal monitoring the structural conditions of a wind turbine[2013/10]
French:Méthode et dispositif de surveillance thermique de l'état structurel d'une éolienne[2013/10]
Examination procedure05.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
08.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2015Fee for grant paid
12.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.03.2016   
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stornebel, Kai
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
 [2016/18]
03.05.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2072/17
17.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2012
AL24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU31.08.2012
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
Former [2017/38]HU31.08.2012
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
Former [2017/22]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
FR31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
Former [2016/18]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
Former [2015/51]LT24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
Former [2015/50]LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
Former [2015/49]LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
NO24.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010103260  (WILLIAMS SCOT I [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0024]; figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]  - MEINLSCHMIDT P ET AL, "Thermographic inspection of rotor blades", INTERNET CITATION, ISSN 1435-4934, (20060926), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/ecndt2006/doc/Tu.1.5.3.pdf, (20090429), XP002525987 [A] 1-11 * pages 1-3; figure 6 *
 [A]  - Georg Dittié ET AL, "Umwelteinflüsse auf die Genauigkeit von Gebäudethermografien", (20070928), URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/dgzfp-irt-2007/Inhalt/v01.pdf, (20140725), XP055131762 [A] 1-11 * pages 1,3-6 *
by applicantDE102010048400
 WO2011113402
OppositionUS2003127862
 DE10022568
 WO2006074690
 WO2009071056
 WO2010051278
 WO2011113402
    - MEINLSCHMIDT, P.; et al., "Thermographic Inspection of Rotor Blades", Journal of Non-destructive Testing;, Berlin, ISSN 1435-4934, (20060925), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/ecndt2006/doc/Tu.1.5.3.pdf, XP002525987
    - "Internetauftritt der IHK Nürnberg für Mittelfranken entnommen", WiM - Wirtschaft in Mittelfranken, (20060100), page 49;, URL: https://www.ihk-nuernberg.de/de/IHK-Magazin-WiM/WiM-Archiv/WIM-Daten/2006- 01/Unternehmen-und-Personen/Technologiefuehrer-bei-Infrarot-Kameras.jsp
    - RUTZ, F.; et al., "Non-Destructive Testing of Glass-Fibre Reinforced Polymers using Te- rahertz Spectroscopy", Journal of Non-destructive Testing, Berlin, ISSN 1435-4934, (20060925), pages 1 - 8, URL: Journal of Nondestructive Testing, XP055274660