blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2579145

EP2579145 - Accessory to improve user experience with an electronic display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.07.2020
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Mobile Communications AB
Nya Vattentornet
221 88 Lund / SE
[2013/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Masuda, Takefumi
Nya Vattentornet
221 88 Lund / SE
02 / Okuda, Tetsuya
100 Redwood Shores Parkway
Redwood City, CA California 94065 / US
03 / Subba, Chandrashekar
100 Redwood Shores Parkway
Redwood City, CA California 94065 / US
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Aera A/S
Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor
1153 Copenhagen / DK
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12182742.203.09.2012
[2013/15]
Priority number, dateUS20111326788106.10.2011         Original published format: US201113267881
[2013/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2579145
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2579145
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/0488, G06F1/32, H04M1/725
[2017/25]
CPC:
G06F3/04883 (EP,US); G06F1/3212 (EP,US); G06F1/3262 (EP,US);
G06F3/0393 (EP); G06F2203/0383 (EP,US); G06F2203/04105 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04808 (EP,US); H04M1/72415 (EP,US); Y02D10/00 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2013/15]G06F3/0488, G06F1/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/05]
Former [2013/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zubehör zur Verbesserung der Benutzererfahrung mit einer elektronischen Anzeige[2013/15]
English:Accessory to improve user experience with an electronic display[2013/15]
French:Accessoire pour améliorer l'expérience de l'utilisateur avec un affichage électronique[2013/15]
Examination procedure03.09.2012Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/05]
21.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2020Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2020
01.04.2020Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/34]
11.04.2020Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/34]
17.06.2020Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009167682  (YAMASHITA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8,16,19,20 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0168] * * figures 1-3,12 * [Y] 3-7,9,10,12-15,17,18 [I] 11;
 [Y]US2009251436  (KESKIN MUSTAFA [US]) [Y] 18* paragraph [0051] *;
 [Y]WO2010084498  (ZRRO TECHNOLOGIES 2009 LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 3-6,9,10,13,15,17 * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 30 * * page 16, line 27 - page 17, line 26 * * figures 4,5A-5D,12 *;
 [Y]US2010220053  (ISHII KOSEI [JP]) [Y] 7,12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0052] * * figures 1,6 *;
 [Y]US2011210931  (SHAI SAAR [IL]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0285] - paragraph [0289]; figure 9B *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.