EP2641731 - A method for manufacturing of cardboard boxes and a cardboard box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EGC SEED CAPITAL Sp. z.o.o. Zeligowskiego 3/5 90-752 Lodz / PL | [2016/07] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states R&D Project Sp. z o.o. Pilsudskiego 141 92-318 Lodz / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kecerski, Tomasz Skrzetuskiego 10 m. 1 92-432 Lodz / PL | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Pawlowski, Adam Eupatent.PL ul. Zeligowskiego 3/5 90-752 Lodz / PL | Application number, filing date | 12183020.2 | 04.09.2012 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | PL20120398521 | 20.03.2012 Original published format: PL 39852112 | [2013/39] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2641731 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2641731 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/25, B31B1/62, B31B17/60, B65D5/32, B65D5/42 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B65D5/32 (EP,US);
B65D5/02 (EP);
B31B2105/00 (EP,US);
B31B2105/001 (EP);
B31B2105/0022 (EP);
B31B2110/35 (EP);
B31B2120/30 (EP);
B31B2120/50 (EP);
B31B50/142 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2013/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kartonschachteln sowie Kartonschachtel | [2013/39] | English: | A method for manufacturing of cardboard boxes and a cardboard box | [2013/39] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de boîtes en carton et boîte en carton | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5191221U (.) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE2709025 (RHEINISCHE WELLPAPPENFABRIK) [A] 1-5 * page 7, paragraph 3; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS5542550U (.) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-5 *; | [I]JPH0227321U (.) [I] 1-5 * figures 1-9 *; | [A]JPH02190324 (HONSHU PAPER CO LTD) [A] 1-5* abstract * |