Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2706076

EP2706076 - Hardening compounds on the basis of epoxide resins without benzyl alcohol [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.07.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evonik Industries AG
Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
[2014/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Ortelt, Martina
Mühlenbrok 7
48249 Dülmen / DE
02 / Spyrou, Emmanouil
Zur Obstwiese 58
46514 Schermbeck / DE
03 / Pfeffer, Jan Christoph
Büdesheimer Ring 8d
63452 Hanau / DE
04 / Fuchsmann, Dirk
Zum Seeblick 35
45721 Haltern am See / DE
05 / Kohlstruk, Britta
Am alten Stadion 33
48249 Dülmen / DE
06 / Haas, Thomas
Backenkamp 9
48161 Münster / DE
 [2014/11]
Representative(s)f & e patent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date12183423.807.09.2012
[2014/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2706076
Date:12.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2706076
Date:17.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08G59/50, C09D163/00
[2014/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/11]
TitleGerman:Härtbare Zusammensetzungen auf der Basis von Epoxidharzen ohne Benzylalkohol[2014/11]
English:Hardening compounds on the basis of epoxide resins without benzyl alcohol[2014/11]
French:Compositions durcissables à base de résines époxy sans alcool benzylique[2014/11]
Examination procedure22.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
30.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2014Fee for grant paid
06.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.09.2015  21.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2016/19]
Former [2015/44]
Opponent(s)01  16.09.2015  21.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
26.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2086/17
28.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
07.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.09.2012
AL17.12.2014
BG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MK17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
SM17.12.2014
TR17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE07.09.2015
LU07.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
AT07.09.2017
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/10]HU07.09.2012
AL17.12.2014
BG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MK17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
SM17.12.2014
TR17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE07.09.2015
LU07.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
AT07.09.2017
Former [2018/46]HU07.09.2012
AL17.12.2014
BG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MK17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
SM17.12.2014
TR17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE07.09.2015
LU07.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
Former [2018/31]HU07.09.2012
BG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MK17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
SM17.12.2014
TR17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE07.09.2015
LU07.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
Former [2017/39]HU07.09.2012
BG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
SM17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE07.09.2015
LU07.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
Former [2017/22]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE07.09.2015
LU07.09.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE07.09.2015
LU07.09.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
LU07.09.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
LU07.09.2015
Former [2016/12]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/38]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/35]EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/24]FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT17.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1019925  (CIBA LTD) [A] 1-18 * example VIII; table II *;
 [A]US3055914  (GARBER JOHN D, et al) [A] 1-18 * column 4, line 25 - line 35 * * column 1, line 36 - line 40 *;
 [A]US4639493  (DICKIE RAY A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 1 *;
 [A]US2011281117  (ORTELT MARTINA [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * claims 1,8,9,10,11 *
 [A]  - XIAODUN HE ET AL, "EVALUATION OF FURFURYLAMINES AS CURING AGENTS FOR EPOXY RESINS", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19920330), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0360-6376, pages 533 - 542, XP000258557 [A] 1-18 * page 534 *
by applicantDE102010030991
 EP1117001
    - H. SCHUHMANN, Handbuch Betonschutz durch Beschichtungen, EXPERT VERLAG, (1992), pages 396 - 428
    - P.K.MALLICK, Fiber-Reinforced Composites, Materials, Manufacturing, and Design, CRC PRESS, pages 60 - 76