Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2567835

EP2567835 - Tow bar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.07.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACPS Automotive GmbH
Steinbeisstrasse 6
71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2018/02]For all designated states
Bosal ACPS Holding 2 B.V.
Kamerlingh Onnesweg 5
4131 PK Vianen / NL
Former [2013/11]For all designated states
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Inventor(s)01 / Gentner, Wolfgang
Ziegeläckerstrasse 23
71711 Steinheim / DE
02 / Rimmelspacher, Bernhard
Gartenstrasse 11
76287 Rheinstetten / DE
03 / Wegner, Bert
Filsstrasse 34
73333 Gingen / DE
04 / Still, Jürgen
Zumsteegstrasse 3
71640 Ludwigsburg / DE
05 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstr. 37
71679 Asperg / DE
 [2013/11]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/32]
Former [2013/11]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12183764.510.09.2012
[2013/11]
Priority number, dateDE2011105350612.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011053506
[2013/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2567835
Date:13.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2567835
Date:10.08.2016
Language:DE
[2016/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/54
[2013/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/32]
Former [2013/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung[2013/11]
English:Tow bar[2013/11]
French:Attelage[2013/11]
Examination procedure11.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
02.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2016Fee for grant paid
10.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.05.2017   
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
 [2017/24]
20.06.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.10.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
03.12.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.12.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.01.2019Appeal received No.  T0181/19
10.04.2019Statement of grounds filed
29.01.2019Appeal received No.  T0181/19
02.04.2019Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.09.2012
AL10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
TR10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
LU10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
AT10.09.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2018/46]HU10.09.2012
AL10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
TR10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
LU10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/31]HU10.09.2012
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
TR10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
LU10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/29]HU10.09.2012
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
TR10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
LU10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU10.09.2012
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
LU10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/40]CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
LU10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/35]CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/32]CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE10.09.2016
BE30.09.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/13]ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
BE30.09.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/11]ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
BE30.09.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
BE30.09.2016
NO10.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT10.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19859961  (WESTFALIA WERKE GMBH & CO [DE] WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-14 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 47 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP1142732  (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE] SCAMBIA IND DEV AG [LI]) [X] 1,6-9 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0110] * * figures 1,4,14,15 *;
 [A]DE102006044401  (BPW FAHRZEUGTECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-3,5 *
OppositionDE19859961
 EP1142732
 DE102006044401
 WO03072375
 EP1557298
 DE202006008463U
 EP1970224
 DE10320302
 EP1024036