blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2570899 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201110289572 EP12183962



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2013069890Global Dossier 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201110289572 18.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101452954BGlobal Dossier 21.10.2014B1
KR20130030721 27.03.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201110289572 18.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5686777BGlobal Dossier 18.03.2015B2
JP2013065009 11.04.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201110289572 18.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102999200Global Dossier 27.03.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201110289572 18.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2570899Global Dossier 08.11.2017B1
EP2570899 10.06.2015A3
EP2570899 20.03.2013A2
Priority number Date
CN201110289572 18.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI581133B 01.05.2017B
TW201314522 01.04.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201110289572 18.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWM440475U 01.11.2012U
Priority number Date
CN201110289572 18.09.2011