Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2572808

EP2572808 - Cold-rolling mill, tandem rolling system, reversing rolling system, modification method of rolling system, and operating method of cold-rolling mill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi-Hitachi Metals Machinery, Inc.
34-6, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
[2013/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Yasunari Shinichi
c/o Mitsubishi-Hitachi Metals Machinery, Inc.
34-6, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 108-0014 / JP
02 / Shimaya, Fumihisa
c/o Mitsubishi-Hitachi Metals Machinery, Inc.
Hiroshima Works, 6-22, Kanon-Shinmachi 4-chome
Nishi-ku
Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima, 733-8553 / JP
 [2013/13]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstraße 10
80538 München / DE
Former [2013/13]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12184124.112.09.2012
[2013/13]
Priority number, dateWO2011JP7139120.09.2011         Original published format: PCT/JP2011/071391
[2013/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2572808
Date:27.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2572808
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:B21B13/14, B21B29/00
[2013/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/13]
TitleGerman:Kaltwalzwerk, Tandemwalzsystem, Umkehrwalzsystem, Modifikationsverfahren des Walzsystems und Betriebsverfahren des Kaltwalzwerks[2013/13]
English:Cold-rolling mill, tandem rolling system, reversing rolling system, modification method of rolling system, and operating method of cold-rolling mill[2013/13]
French:Laminoir à froid, système de laminage en tandem, système de roulement d'inversion, procédé de modification d'un système de roulement et procédé de fonctionnement d'un laminoir à froid[2013/13]
Examination procedure17.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/13]
29.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2014Fee for grant paid
08.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.05.2016  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SMS group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Klüppel, Walter
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
 [2016/37]
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SMS Siemag AG
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Klüppel, Walter
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
27.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition05.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1109/17
21.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.09.2012
AL21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MK21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
GB12.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU12.09.2012
BE21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MK21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
GB12.09.2016
Former [2017/42]HU12.09.2012
BE21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
GB12.09.2016
Former [2016/33]HU12.09.2012
BE21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/32]HU12.09.2012
BE21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
Former [2016/31]BE21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
Former [2016/24]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
Former [2015/38]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IE12.09.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/36]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/22]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
LU12.09.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/20]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/12]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/11]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/10]BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/08]BE21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/02]ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2014/52]ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/50]ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/49]FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/48]LT21.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE10208389  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * figures 1-8; claims 1-13 * [Y] 4-8 [I] 12;
 [Y]JPH11179408  (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 4 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0154896  (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [Y] 5,8 * figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]JPS59185508  (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 6,7 * abstract *
by applicantJPH0334928B
    - "Basics and Application of Strip Rolling - Crown and Flatness", Textbook of the 101st Lecture on Plastic Working, JAPAN SOCIETY FOR TECHNOLOGY OF PLASTICITY, page 62