Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2573723

EP2573723 - Method for executing a sequence control of a mixed process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trux, Walter
Pienzenauer Straße 88
81925 München / DE
[2013/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/13]
Representative(s)Kruspig, Volkmar
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/13]Kruspig, Volkmar
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12184164.713.09.2012
[2013/13]
Priority number, dateDE20111011441626.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011114416
DE20121010668824.07.2012         Original published format: DE102012106688
DE20121021553831.08.2012         Original published format: DE102012215538
[2013/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2573723
Date:27.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2573723
Date:25.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/06
[2013/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Ausführen einer Ablaufsteuerung eines gemischten Prozesses[2013/13]
English:Method for executing a sequence control of a mixed process[2013/13]
French:Procédé de sortie d'une commande de déroulement d'un processus mixte[2013/13]
Examination procedure17.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
29.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2016
22.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.09.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination02.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0549/17
01.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201605   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2016
30.09.201908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2004162741  (FLAXER DAVID [US] ET AL) [I] 1-23 * abstract * * figures 22-24 * * claims 1-9 *;
 [I]WO2004102454  (SAP AG [DE]; WODTKE DIRK [US]; JORDT NICOLAI [DE]; KRUSE MATTHIAS [US]) [I] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2004046832  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]; FRAUENHOFFER FRANZ [DE]; GLOGER EBERHARD [DE) [I] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP2199956  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [I]DE102004043419  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-23 * the whole document *