Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2570926

EP2570926 - Data backup method and data backup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2015
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ivastsuk-Kienbaum, Jurij
Keplerstraße 22
86179 Augsburg / DE
[2013/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/12]
Representative(s)Charrier Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Fuggerstraße 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/12]Charrier, Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date12184474.014.09.2012
[2013/12]
Priority number, dateDE2011105361414.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011053614
[2013/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2570926
Date:20.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2570926
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14
[2013/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/12]
TitleGerman:Datensicherungsverfahren und Datensicherungsvorrichtung[2013/12]
English:Data backup method and data backup apparatus[2013/12]
French:Procédé de sécurisation des données et dispositif de sécurisation des données[2013/12]
Examination procedure19.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
29.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.08.2014Fee for grant paid
04.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP14158003.5  / EP2752769
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2013
Opposition(s)23.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.09.2012
AL22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU14.09.2012
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2017/38]HU14.09.2012
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2017/22]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/23]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/12]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT22.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2006200639  (LEVY ITZHAK [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 14;
 [Y]US2005010835  (CHILDS PHILIP LEE [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,15 * abstract * * figures 2,4,5 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [Y]US2008115071  (FAIR THOMAS T [US]) [Y] 2-6 * abstract * * figures 2,10,12,13 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] *;
 [Y]EP1168174  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] *;
 [A]EP1914628  (ASUSTEK COMP INC [TW]) [A] 10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010037092  (ZAMORA URBANO [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] *
by applicantDE202006000075U
 DE102004055956