Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2605200

EP2605200 - Method for the planning of a workflow of agricultural tasks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Mühlenwinkel 1
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
[2016/48]
Former [2013/25]For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstrasse 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grothaus, Hans-Peter
Am Poggenpohl 38
33619 Bielefeld / DE
02 / Huster, Jochen
Wilhelm-Baumann-Straße 11 a
33330 Gütersloh / DE
03 / Reinecke, Max
Aabach Aue 6
33775 Versmold / DE
04 / Steckel, Thilo
Strotheide 51
33330 Gütersloh / DE
 [2013/25]
Representative(s)CLAAS Gruppe
Mühlenwinkel 1
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date12184631.517.09.2012
[2013/25]
Priority number, dateDE2011108870015.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011088700
[2013/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2605200
Date:19.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/06
[2013/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Planung einer Prozesskette für einen landwirtschaftlichen Arbeitseinsatz[2013/25]
English:Method for the planning of a workflow of agricultural tasks[2013/25]
French:Methode pour la planification d'une chaîne des tâches agricoles[2013/25]
Examination procedure17.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/06]
10.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination15.04.2015Appeal received No.  T1766/15
01.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
07.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201403   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[IL]  - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europ�ischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 �ber Gesch�ftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqu� de l'Office europ�en des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les m�thodes dans le domaine des activit�s �conomiques", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS., OEB, MUNCHEN., DE, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * [L] 1-12
by applicantDE102004027242
 EP1633105
 DE102006044730
 DE102006015204
 DE102008021785
 EP2146307
 WO2011104085
 DE102008050460