Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2712500

EP2712500 - Mobile platform arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neurotar Oy
Viikinkaari 4
00790 Helsinki / FI
[2014/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Osmekhin, Sergey
Laukkarinne 5 A 13
01200 Vantaa / FI
02 / Khirug, Leonard
Tilanhoitajankaari 4 C 71
00790 Helsinki / FI
 [2014/14]
Representative(s)Heinonen & Co
Attorneys-at-Law Ltd
Fabianinkatu 29 B
00100 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]IPR Partners Ltd
Hietalahdenranta 13
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2014/14]Värilä, Risto Sakari
IPR Partners Oy
Bulevardi 2-4
00120 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date12186005.026.09.2012
[2014/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2712500
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2712500
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/03, A01K29/00
[2014/32]
Former International [2014/14]A01K29/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/14]
TitleGerman:Mobile Plattformanordnung[2014/14]
English:Mobile platform arrangement[2014/14]
French:Agencement de plateforme mobile[2014/14]
Examination procedure11.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/23]
13.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.11.2014Fee for grant paid
26.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.05.2014
Opposition(s)15.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.09.2012
AL14.01.2015
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE26.09.2015
LU26.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU26.09.2012
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE26.09.2015
LU26.09.2015
Former [2017/39]HU26.09.2012
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE26.09.2015
LU26.09.2015
Former [2017/22]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE26.09.2015
LU26.09.2015
Former [2016/33]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE26.09.2015
LU26.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU26.09.2015
Former [2016/23]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU26.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU26.09.2015
Former [2016/12]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2016/03]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/49]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/39]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/38]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/37]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/36]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/35]ES14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/33]ES14.01.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0872179  (BIOANALYTICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,4,14,17,18 * column 8, line 39 - column 12, line 45; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US6279511  (LOUGHNANE MICHAEL H [US]) [A] 1,18 * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 3; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0363755  (TOYO SANGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,18 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 22; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6602220  (LUDVIG NANDOR [US] ET AL) [A] 14-18 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2007006820  (DENAULT STEVEN [US] ET AL) [A] 14,17,18 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - MATSAMURA, "a novel apparatus that permits multiple routes for infusions and boy-fluid collections in a freely moving animal", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950101), vol. 57, doi:10.1016/0165-0270(94)00107-R, ISSN 0165-0270, pages 145 - 149, XP002109530 [A] 1,14-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-0270(94)00107-R
by applicantUS3974798
 US7086350
 US1794951
    - HOFER ET AL., "Experience leaves a lasting structural trace in cortical circuits", NATURE, (2009), vol. 457, no. 7227, pages 313 - 7
    - HOLTMAAT ET AL., "Long-term, high-resolution imaging in the mouse neocortex through a chronic cranial window", NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2009), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 1128 - 44
    - FLUSBERG ET AL., "Fiber-optic fluorescence imaging", NATURE METHODS, (2005), vol. 2, no. 12, pages 941 - 50
    - FLUSBERG ET AL., "High-speed, miniaturized fluorescence microscopy in freely moving mice", NATURE METHODS, (2008), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 935 - 8
    - YANG ET AL., "Thinned-skull cranial window technique for long-term imaging of the cortex in live mice", NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2010), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 201 - 8
    - LARSEN; LANGMOEN, "The effect of volatile anaesthetics on synaptic release and uptake of glutamate", REVIEW. TOXICOL LETT, (1998), vol. 100-101, pages 59 - 64
    - NALLASAMY; TSAO, "Functional connectivity in the brain: effects of anesthesia", NEUROSCIENTIST, (2011), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 94 - 106
    - CHAU PL., "New insights into the molecular mechanisms of general anaesthetics", REVIEW. BR J PHARMACOL, (2010), vol. 161, no. 2, pages 288 - 307
    - WIENISCH ET AL., "Two-photon imaging of neural activity in awake, head-fixed mice", NEURONAL NETWORK ANALYSIS: NEUROMETHODS, (2012), vol. 67, pages 45 - 60
    - HOLSCHER ET AL., "Rats are able to navigate in virtual reality", J EXP BIOL, (2005), vol. 208, no. 3, pages 561 - 569
    - DOMBECK ET AL., "Imaging large-scale neural activity with cellular resolution in awake, mobile mice", NEURON, (2007), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 43 - 57
    - KENDLER HH., "An investigation of latent learning in a T-maze", J COMP PHYSIOL PSYCHOL., (1947), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 265 - 270