Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2713050

EP2713050 - Memory shape alloy actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inventas AG
Salvemattweg 18
6340 Baar / CH
[2016/43]
Former [2015/43]For all designated states
Siemens Schweiz AG
Freilagerstrasse 40
8047 Zürich / CH
For all designated states
Inventas AG
Salvemattweg 18
6340 Baar / CH
Former [2014/14]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
For all designated states
Inventas AG
Salvemattweg 18
6340 Baar / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hagmann, Stefan
Stalden 36
6344 Meierskappel / CH
02 / Partel, Robert
St. Johannesstr. 18
6300 Zug / CH
03 / Risch, Fabian
Weizenstr. 9
8037 Zürich / CH
 [2014/14]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter , et al
Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. Peter Riebling Postfach 3160
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date12186727.928.09.2012
[2014/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2713050
Date:02.04.2014
Language:DE
[2014/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:F03G7/06
[2014/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Stellantrieb mittels eines Formgedächtniselements[2014/14]
English:Memory shape alloy actuator[2014/14]
French:Mécanisme de commande parmi un alliage à mémoire de forme[2014/14]
Examination procedure18.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/18]
29.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0304944  (JOHNSON SERVICE CO [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1-5 * [I] 12;
 [X]US4841730  (MCDONALD JOHN E [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 1 - column 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [XD]DE9100339U  (KRUPP INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH) [XD] 1-9,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4765139  (WOOD CHARLES [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-12 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]WO03069644  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11 * page 2, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]US7159398  (BUSHNELL GLENN S [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US6272857  (VARMA VENUGOPAL K [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-12 * column 5, line 24 - line 30; figures 1-3 *
by applicantDE9100339U
 US2001038082
 EP0922892
 EP1926928