|
02.09.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |