EP2578988 - Scanning white-light interferometer and method for spatially resolved optical measurement of the surface geometry of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polytec GmbH Polytec Platz 1-7 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rembe, Christian Schlehenweg 33 76337 Waldbronn / DE | 02 /
Boedecker, Sebastian Schützenstrasse 13 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Grittmann, Markus Indianaring 2 76149 Karlsruhe / DE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 12186888.9 | 01.10.2012 | [2013/15] | Priority number, date | DE201110115027 | 07.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011115027 | [2013/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2578988 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01B11/24 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G01B9/0209 (EP,US);
G01B11/2441 (EP,US);
G01B9/02064 (EP,US);
G01B9/0207 (EP,US);
G01B2290/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kohärenzrasterinterferometer und Verfahren zur ortsaufgelösten optischen Vermessung der Oberflächengeometrie eines Objekts | [2013/15] | English: | Scanning white-light interferometer and method for spatially resolved optical measurement of the surface geometry of an object | [2013/15] | French: | Interféromètre de trame de cohérence et procédé de mesure optique à résolution spatiale de la géométrie de surface d'un objet | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 18.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002196450 (OLSZAK ARTUR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0009] - paragraph [0014] ** paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2005225769 (BANKHEAD ANDREW D [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1,3 * [I] 6,8,11-15; | [XI]US2010128276 (DE GROOT PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0189]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0280] * [I] 6,8,11-15; | [I] - ARTUR OLSZAK, JOANNA SCHMIT, "High-stability white-light interferometry with reference signal for real-time correction of scanning errors", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (20030101), vol. 42, no. 1, doi:10.1117/1.1523942, ISSN 0091-3286, page 54, XP055049348 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.1523942 | by applicant | DE102005023212 |