EP2604721 - Chemical bath deposition (CBD) apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Wei-Tse 2F., No. 144, Taoying Rd. Taoyuan City Taoyuan County 330 / TW | 02 /
Hsieh, Tung-Po 3F.-2, No. 11, Ln. 6 Xinzhong St. Songshan Dist. Taipei City 105 / TW | 03 /
Tsai, Song-Yeu 4F., No. 2, Lane 58 Sec. 1, Shihpai Rd. Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12188055.3 | 10.10.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | TW20110146215 | 14.12.2011 Original published format: TW 100146215 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2604721 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2604721 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/12, B05C3/02 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C23C18/12 (EP,US);
B05C3/02 (US);
C23C18/1204 (EP,US);
C23C18/125 (EP,US);
C23C18/1283 (EP,US);
C23C18/1295 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/25] | C23C18/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2013/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Chemiebadabscheidungsvorrichtung | [2013/25] | English: | Chemical bath deposition (CBD) apparatus | [2013/25] | French: | Appareil de dépôt par bain chimique (CBD) | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011092236 (WUERTH SOLAR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 9, line 7 - page 10, line 24 *; | [XI]WO2009111053 (GLOBAL SOLAR ENERGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0031] , [ 0032] , [ 0041] , [ 0042] , [ 0052] * [I] 12; | [X]WO2009075944 (ROUSSILLON YANN [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10,11,13-18 * abstract * * figures 7-9, 29, 30 * * paragraphs [0068] - [0072] - [ 0102] , [ 0130] *; | [XI]US2008299411 (OLADEJI ISAIAH O [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10,11,13-18 * abstract * * figures 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0041] , [ 0048] , [ 0049] * [I] 9; | [X]US2011021007 (DE ROCHEMONT L PIERRE [US], et al) [X] 1,6,10,11,14-18 * abstract * * figures 7, 8A, 8B, 9, 10 * * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0111] - [0125] *; | [X]US2011256656 (WANG JIAXIONG [US]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] *; | [A]US2007122564 (CHENG KONG-WEI [TW], et al) [A] 4 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0030] * |