blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2584783

EP2584783 - Projector, projection control method, and storage medium storing program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2023
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.02.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
[2022/10]
Former [2013/17]For all designated states
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oda, Kiyoshi
c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamura R&D Center
2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
02 / Narikawa, Tetsuro
c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamura R&D Center
2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
 [2022/10]
Former [2013/17]01 / Oda, Kiyoshi
c/o Intellectual Property Department
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamura R&D Center
2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
02 / Narikawa, Tetsuro
c/o Intellectual Property Department
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamura R&D Center
2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2022/10]
Former [2013/17]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12188627.916.10.2012
[2013/17]
Priority number, dateJP2011022809417.10.2011         Original published format: JP 2011228094
[2013/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2584783
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2584783
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2584783
Date:09.03.2022
Language:EN
[2022/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:H04N9/31
[2013/17]
CPC:
H04N9/3182 (EP,US); G03B21/204 (EP,US); H04N9/3111 (EP,US);
H04N9/3158 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/17]
TitleGerman:Projektor, Projektionssteuerungsverfahren und Speichermedium mit Programm[2013/17]
English:Projector, projection control method, and storage medium storing program[2013/17]
French:Projecteur, procédé de contrôle de projection et support de stockage avec programme[2013/17]
Examination procedure16.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/17]
28.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2021Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.10.2021
28.10.2021Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2022Fee for grant paid
31.01.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.01.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2020
Opposition(s)12.12.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
28.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.10.2012
AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CY09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
IT09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
MK09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
TR09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
IE16.10.2022
LU16.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
[2024/29]
Former [2024/27]HU16.10.2012
AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CY09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
IT09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
MK09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
IE16.10.2022
LU16.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2024/21]HU16.10.2012
AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CY09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
IT09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
IE16.10.2022
LU16.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2024/18]HU16.10.2012
AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
IT09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
IE16.10.2022
LU16.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/48]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
IT09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
IE16.10.2022
LU16.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/42]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
IT09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
LU16.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/35]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
IT09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
LU16.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/30]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
LU16.10.2022
Former [2023/25]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
MC09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2023/10]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SI09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2023/07]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
DK09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2023/01]AL09.03.2022
AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2022/51]AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
IS09.07.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2022/50]AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
PL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2022/49]AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2022/48]AT09.03.2022
CZ09.03.2022
EE09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2022/47]AT09.03.2022
ES09.03.2022
FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
RO09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
PT11.07.2022
Former [2022/44]FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
NL09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
Former [2022/39]FI09.03.2022
HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
Former [2022/36]HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
LV09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
GR10.06.2022
Former [2022/35]HR09.03.2022
LT09.03.2022
RS09.03.2022
SE09.03.2022
BG09.06.2022
NO09.06.2022
Former [2022/33]LT09.03.2022
NO09.06.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005280850  (KIM IL-DO [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 6, 7 *;
 [A]US2006215128  (IWANAGA MASAKUNI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 2, 6, 7 *;
 [A]EP2187381  (NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] ** figures 1, 3.5 *;
 [XI]US2010328554  (SHIBASAKI MAMORU [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-10,13-15,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0 75] , [0 76] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0217] * * figures 1, 3, 4, 11 * [I] 3,4,11,12,16,17
ExaminationUS2006268236
by applicantJP2011095388
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.