Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2565206

EP2565206 - Antibody purification by cation exchange chromatography [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2013/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Lebreton, Benedicte Andree
1918 Pierce Street
San Francisco, CA 94115 / US
02 / O'Connor, Deborah Ann
1641 Cedar Street
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
03 / Safta, Aurelia
1655 North California Boulevard, nº 453
Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US
04 / Sharma, Mandakini
563 Montego Terrace
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
 [2016/13]
Former [2013/10]01 / Lebreton, Benedicte Andree
1880 Vallejo Street 3
San Francisco, CA 94123 / US
02 / O'Connor, Deborah Ann
1641 Cedar Street
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
03 / Safta, Aurelia
1655 North California Boulevard, nº 453
Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US
04 / Sharma, Mandakini
563 Montego Terrace
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Representative(s)Green, Katherine , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2016/13]
Former [2013/10]Green, Katherine , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date12189190.729.10.2008
[2013/10]
Priority number, dateUS20070983825P30.10.2007         Original published format: US 983825 P
[2013/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2565206
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2565206
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2565206
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/06, C07K1/18, C07K16/28, C07K1/36
[2015/39]
Former International [2013/10]C07K16/06, C07K1/18, C07K16/22, C07K16/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/13]
Former [2013/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL22.04.2014
BA22.04.2014
MK22.04.2014
RS22.04.2014
TitleGerman:Antikörperreinigung durch Kationaustauschchromatografie[2013/10]
English:Antibody purification by cation exchange chromatography[2013/10]
French:Purification d'anticorps par chromatographie à échange de cations[2013/10]
Examination procedure22.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/23]
19.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2016Fee for grant paid
25.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08844379.1  / EP2215117
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080844379) is  19.10.2010
Opposition(s)03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.03.2015Request for further processing filed
05.03.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.03.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
LU29.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]CY30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
LU29.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/29]CY30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
LU29.10.2016
Former [2017/47]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
LU29.10.2016
Former [2016/51]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/50]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/36]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/35]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO02096457  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 24, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]WO2004001007  (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,5,6 *;
 [A]WO2005066139  (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0609] *;
 [AD]US6339142  (BASEY CAROL D [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 17, line 36 - line 43 * * column 17, line 47 - line 52 * * column 17, line 57 - line 61 * * column 17, line 62 - column 18, line 2 * * column 18, line 10 - line 13 * * column 18, line 17 - line 27 * * column 6, lines 38,44 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9957134  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * example . * * claim - * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2004024866  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * example - *;
 [IA]WO2005115453  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [I] 15 * example 7 * [A] 1-14;
 [X]WO2007028154  (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US], et al) [X] 15 * page 31, line 28 - line 29 *;
 [I]WO2006069403  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [I] 15 * page 46, line 18 - line 21 *
by applicantUS6339142
 US6417355
 US6489447
 US7074404
 US6127526
 US6333398
 US6797814
 US2004082047
 US5110913
 EP0333574
 EP0460426
 EP0556083
 WO8905157
 WO9222653
 WO9306217
 WO9522389
 WO9633208
 WO9640883
 US4753894
 US4966851
 US5112951
 US5115101
 US5118796
 US5169774
 US5196323
 US5256769
 US5279823
 US5429746
 US5451662
 US5525338
 US5677171
 US6005081
 US6054561
 US6267958
 US6417335
 US5534615
 US5091178
 US5725856
 WO0100245
 WO9523865
 WO9630046
 WO9845331
 WO0140309
 US5622700
 WO9823761
 WO9519181
 US5714338
 US5091313
 WO9304173
 WO9726912
 WO9851793
 EP0420937
 WO9806248
 WO9640210
 US4515893
 US5693762
 WO03033658
 WO0224909
 US5736137
 US5595721
 WO03002607
 US5677180
 WO2004056312
 WO2004035607
 US2004167319
 US2004093621
 WO2005000901
 WO2004103404
 US2005025764
 US2003219433
 US2005069545
 WO2005016969
 WO2005014618
 US7169901
 US4816567
 WO9316185
 EP0404097
 WO9311161
 DD266710
 EP0402226
 EP0183070
 EP0244234
 US4767704
 US4657866
 US4927762
 US4560655
 US5122469
 WO9003430
 WO8700195
 USRE30985E
 US3773919
    - BARNTHOUSE ET AL., J. BIOTECH., (1998), vol. 66, pages 125 - 136
    - BLANK ET AL., BIOSEPARATION, (2001), vol. 10, pages 65 - 71
    - FOLLMAN; FAHMER, J. CHROMATOG., (2004), vol. 1024, pages 79 - 85
    - IYER ET AL., BIOPHARM, (2002), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 14 - 16,18,20,53
    - ADACHI ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY. A., (19970228), vol. 763, no. 1-2, pages 57 - 63
    - GAGNON, P, Purification Tools for Monoclonal Antibodies, TUCSON:VALIDATED BIOSYSTEMS, INC., (1996), pages 57 - 86
    - GRAF ET AL., BIOSEPARATION, (199402), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 7 - 20
    - MHATRE ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (19950721), vol. 707, no. 2, pages 225 - 231
    - NEIDHARDT ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1992), vol. 590, no. 2, pages 255 - 261
    - HARRIS; ANGAL, Protein Purification Applications - A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1995), pages 151 - 156
    - SOFER ET AL., Handbook of Process Chromatography: A Guide to Optimization, Scale-up, and Validation, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1997), pages 65 - 80
    - TISHCHENKO ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (19980227), vol. 706, no. 1, pages 157 - 166
    - FITCH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 1382 - 1386
    - NEEDLEMAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - T.E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecular Properties, W.H. FREEMAN & CO., (1983), pages 79 - 86
    - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 4285 - 4289
    - ST JOHN ET AL., CHEST, (1993), vol. 103, page 932
    - KIM ET AL., GROWTH FACTORS, (1992), vol. 7, pages 53 - 64
    - STEPPE ET AL., TRANSPLANT INTL., (1991), vol. 4, pages 3 - 7
    - HOURMANT ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1994), vol. 58, pages 377 - 380
    - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 2623 - 2632
    - CHOY ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 52 - 56
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 337
    - GRAZIANO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, no. 10, pages 4996 - 5002
    - SHARKEY ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5935S - 5945S
    - CERIANI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5852S - 5856S
    - RICHMAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5916S - 5920S
    - LITTON ET AL., EUR J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 1 - 9
    - ELLIS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, no. 2, pages 925 - 937
    - JURCIC ET AL., CANCER RES, (1995), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5908S - 5910S
    - CLARK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 1766
    - REFF ET AL., BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, pages 435 - 445
    - PRESS ET AL., BLOOD, (1987), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 584 - 591
    - GLENNIE; VAN DE WINKEL, DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2003), vol. 8, pages 503 - 510
    - CRAGG ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, pages 1045 - 1052
    - VALENTINE ET AL., Leukocyte Typing III, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1987), page 440
    - HAISMA ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, page 184
    - MOORHOUSE ET AL., J. PHARM BIOMED. ANAL., (1997), vol. 16, pages 593 - 603
    - LEUNG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, page 1306
    - HOUCK ET AL., MOL. ENDOCRIN., (1991), vol. 5, page 1806
    - NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554
    - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - MARKS ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783
    - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258
    - BRUGGERMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNO., (1993), vol. 7, page 33
    - DUCHOSAL ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 355, page 258
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - SIMS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2296
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, page 901
    - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285
    - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2623
    - MORIMOTO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117
    - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81
    - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - ZAPATA ET AL., POLYPEPTIDE ENG., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062
    - TUTT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, page 60
    - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59
    - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216
    - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251
    - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68
 WO1998US13410