EP2574154 - Method of controlling an electrical dimming ballast during low temperature conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lutron Electronics Co., Inc. 7200 Suter Road Coopersburg, PA 18036 / US | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chitta, Venkatesh 4162 Huckleberry Drive Center Valley, PA 18034 / US | 02 /
Ozbek, Mehmet 265 1st Street, Apartment 107 Petaluma, California 94952 / US | 03 /
Quayle, Jonathan Robert 1235 Brentwood Avenue Betlehem, PA 18017 / US | 04 /
Taipale, Mark S. 260 Brenton Circle Harleysville, PA 19438 / US | 05 /
Veskovic, Dragan 1702 Redwood Court Allentown, PA 18104 / US | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel Awapatent AB P.O. Box 99 351 04 Växjö / SE | [2013/13] | Application number, filing date | 12189729.2 | 06.04.2011 | [2013/13] | Priority number, date | US20100321316P | 06.04.2010 Original published format: US 321316 P | US20100374884P | 18.08.2010 Original published format: US 374884 P | US20100955988 | 30.11.2010 Original published format: US 955988 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2574154 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2574154 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/392 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
H05B41/3921 (EP,US);
H05B41/3925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einem elektrischen Dimmvorschaltgerät bei Niedrigtemperaturbedingungen | [2013/13] | English: | Method of controlling an electrical dimming ballast during low temperature conditions | [2013/13] | French: | Procédé de contrôle d'un ballast de gradation électrique pendant des conditions de basse température | [2013/13] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11716108.3 / EP2556728 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110716108) is 30.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6133697 (NAGAI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 48; figures 23-25 * * column 5, line 35 - column 8, line 34; figures 1-7 *; | [I]US2006017389 (NOH SHI YOUL [KR]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] - [0039]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US5248919 | US7489090 | US7528554 | US7764479 | US20100704781 |