Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2590257

EP2590257 - Wireless power receiver and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
[2017/20]
Former [2013/19]For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu
Seoul 100-714 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Ki Min
Seoul Square 541
Namdaemunno 5-ga
Jung-gu, Seoul, 100-714 / KR
02 / Lee, Jung Oh
Seoul Square 541
Namdaemunno 5-ga
Jung-gu, Seoul, 100-714 / KR
 [2019/15]
Former [2013/19]01 / Lee, Ki Min
Seoul Square 541
Namdaemunno 5-ga
Jung-gu, Seoul, 10-714 / KR
02 / Lee, Jung Oh
Seoul Square 541
Namdaemunno 5-ga
Jung-gu, Seoul, 10-714 / KR
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/15]
Former [2014/09]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/19]Dreiss
Patentanwälte
Gerokstraße 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12189931.425.10.2012
[2013/19]
Priority number, dateKR2011011472104.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110114721
[2013/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2590257
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2590257
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2590257
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/22, H01Q7/00, H01Q1/52, H04B5/00, G06K19/07, G06K19/077, H02J50/12, H02J50/80, H02J50/70
[2018/45]
Former International [2015/12]H01Q1/22, H01Q7/00, H01Q1/52, H04B5/00, G06K19/07, G06K19/077
Former International [2013/19]H01Q1/22, H01Q7/00, H01Q1/52
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Former [2013/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Drahtloser Stromempfänger und Steuerverfahren dafür[2013/19]
English:Wireless power receiver and control method thereof[2013/19]
French:Récepteur de puissance sans fil et son procédé de commande[2013/19]
Examination procedure09.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
06.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2019Fee for grant paid
27.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14167637.9  / EP2765647
EP19159579.2  / EP3514887
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2020/03]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/52]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL10.04.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2367262  (HANRIM POSTECH CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 17] , [0 18] * * paragraphs [0059] , [0 70] - paragraph [0078]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0087]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0095]; figure 7 * [I] 4-6;
 [XI]US2010146308  (GIOSCIA RICHARD [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0129]; figures 7A, 8, 9A * * paragraph [0136]; figure 9F * [I] 3-6;
 [X]WO2007015599  (LS CABLE LTD [KR]; PARK DONG-YOUNG [KR]; MOON SUNG-WOOK [KR]; CHOI SUN) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044] - [0 53] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1, 2 *
ExaminationEP0790667