Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2725612

EP2725612 - Heat conductor device and method of forming a heat conductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TP Vision Holding B.V.
Prins Bernhardplein 200
1097 JB Amsterdam / NL
[2014/42]
Former [2014/18]For all designated states
TP Vision Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Luiten, Wendy
c/o TP Vision Netherlands B.V.
Prins Bernhardplein 200, Floor 8
1097 JB Amsterdam / NL
02 / Peeters, Luc Henri Jozef
c/o TP Vision Netherlands B.V.
Prins Bernhardplein 200, Floor 8
1097 JB Amsterdam / NL
 [2014/18]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Busch, Patrick , et al
TP Vision Europe B.V.
Intellectual Property Department
Prins Bernhardplein 200 - Floor 8
1097 JB Amsterdam / NL
Former [2014/18]Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date12190391.829.10.2012
[2014/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2725612
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/66, H01L23/36, H01L23/373
[2014/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wärmeleitervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Wärmeleitervorrichtung[2014/18]
English:Heat conductor device and method of forming a heat conductor device[2014/18]
French:Dispositif conducteur de chaleur et procédé de formation d'un dispositif conducteur de chaleur[2014/18]
Examination procedure04.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/40]
30.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XDA]US2006047053  (PAWLENKO IVAN [US], et al) [XD] 1,11 * paragraph [0034]; figure 4A * [A] 2-10,12-15;
 [A]US2012026692  (LOONG SY-JENQ [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2006047053