Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2728028

EP2728028 - Edelstahllegierung ohne Nickel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd.
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2014/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Dionne, Jean-François
Schulhausstrasse 5A
3210 Kerzers / CH
 [2014/19]
Representative(s)Giraud, Eric , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[2018/14]
Former [2014/19]Giraud, Eric , et al
ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date12191101.002.11.2012
[2014/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2728028
Date:07.05.2014
Language:FR
[2014/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2728028
Date:04.04.2018
Language:FR
[2018/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/00, C22C38/18, C22C30/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/38, G04B37/22
[2018/01]
Former International [2014/19]C22C38/00, C22C38/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/14]
Former [2014/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Nickel-free stainless-steel alloy[2014/19]
English:Edelstahllegierung ohne Nickel[2014/19]
French:Alliage d'acier inoxydable sans nickel[2014/19]
Examination procedure29.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
28.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2018Fee for grant paid
16.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.04.2017
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
MT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
GB02.11.2018
IE02.11.2018
LU02.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2020/03]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
GB02.11.2018
IE02.11.2018
LU02.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
Former [2019/51]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE02.11.2018
LU02.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
Former [2019/48]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE02.11.2018
LU02.11.2018
Former [2019/34]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU02.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/12]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1783240  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,8,10 * claims 1-9 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] * * tables 1-5 * [A] 2,3,5-7,9;
 [XDA]EP1025273  (METALLURG AVANCEE S I M A BR S [FR]) [XD] 1,4,8,10 * claims 1-5 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0061] * [A] 2,3,5-7,9;
 [XA]EP1626101  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,8,10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0044] * * claims 1-6 * * tables 1-4 * [A] 2,3,5-7,9;
 [XAI]EP0896072  (USINOR [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * claims 1-10 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0053] * * page 9 - page 10 * [A] 2,3,5-7,9 [I] 10;
 [XAI]US2009060775  (LIU WEI-MING [CN]) [X] 1,4,8 * claims 1-4 * * tables 1-4 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0045] * [A] 2,3,5-7,9 [I] 10;
 [XAI]DE19716795  (KRUPP VDM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,8 * claims 1-5 * * tables 1-3 * [A] 2,3,5-7,9 [I] 10;
 [XAI]US3904401  (MERTZ DAVID L, et al) [X] 1,4,8 * claims 1-10 * * table I * [A] 2,3,5-7,9 [I] 10;
 [A]CH688862  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-7 * * examples 1-2 *;
 [A]US6682581  (SPEIDEL MARKUS [CH]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-7 * * examples 1-2 *;
 [A]WO0155465  (JENERIC PENTRON INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-24 * * tables 1-2 *
by applicantEP0964071
 EP0629714
 FR2534931
 EP1025273