Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2596886

EP2596886 - Cutting assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/22]Cutting assembly with enhanced coolant delivery
[2014/49]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KENNAMETAL INC.
1600 Technology Way
Latrobe, PA 15650 / US
[2015/18]
Former [2013/22]For all designated states
Kennametal Inc.
1600 Technology Way
Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Henry, Nicholas Joseph
913 Donohoe Road
Latrobe, PA Pennsylvania 15650 / US
02 / Mizgalski, Kent Peter
127 Fox Haven Drive
Stahltown, PA Pennsylvania 15687 / US
 [2013/22]
Representative(s)Prinz & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[2015/18]
Former [2013/22]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12191349.506.11.2012
[2013/22]
Priority number, dateUS20111330258122.11.2011         Original published format: US201113302581
[2013/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2596886
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2596886
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:B23D33/00, B23D15/14, B23B29/04, B23B27/04, B23B27/10
[2017/34]
Former International [2017/33]B23D33/00, B23D15/14
Former International [2013/22]B23B27/10, B23B29/04, B23B27/04, B23Q11/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2013/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schneidanordnung mit verbesserter Kühlmittelversorgung[2017/33]
English:Cutting assembly[2014/49]
French:Ensemble de coupe avec une meilleure distribution de réfrigérant[2017/33]
Former [2013/22]Schneidanordnung mit verbesserter Kühlmittelversorgung
Former [2013/22]Cutting assembly with enhanced coolant delivery
Former [2013/22]Ensemble de coupe avec une meilleure distribution de réfrigérant
Examination procedure05.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/34]
29.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2015Fee for grant paid
16.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.01.2016  03.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KARL-HEINZ ARNOLD GmbH
Karlsbader Strasse 4
73760 Ostfildern / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB
Plochinger Straße 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
 02  28.01.2016  03.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Opponent's representative
WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98
DE-65185 Wiesbaden / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  28.01.2016  03.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KARL-HEINZ ARNOLD GmbH
Karlsbader Strasse 4
73760 Ostfildern / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB
Plochinger Straße 109
DE-73730 Esslingen / DE
 02  28.01.2016  03.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Opponent's representative
WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98
DE-65185 Wiesbaden / DE
04.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2710/17
22.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
12.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2710/17
16.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
18.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2710/17
15.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
15.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.11.2012
AL29.04.2015
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MK29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
SM29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE06.11.2015
LU06.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU06.11.2012
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MK29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
SM29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE06.11.2015
LU06.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU06.11.2012
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
SM29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE06.11.2015
LU06.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE06.11.2015
LU06.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/37]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU06.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU06.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU06.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/21]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL29.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2008066473  (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * figures 1-8 * * claims 1,6,7 * * page 7, line 15 - line 30 * * page 9, line 13 - line 28 * [Y] 5-7,9-12;
 [Y]EP2097197  (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE]) [Y] 5-7,9-12 * figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0029] * * the whole document *;
 [A]WO02096598  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 2A * * page 10, line 8 - line 31 *;
 [AD]WO2009141815  (ISCAR LTD [IL], et al) [AD] 1-12 * figures 1-10 * * the whole document *
by applicantUS6261032
 WO2009141815
 US5439327
 US5775854
 US6705805
 US7641422
OppositionWO2008066473
 EP2097197
 WO02096598
 WO2009141815
 JP2007044834
 AT218821B
 DE3740814
 EP2353779
 GB1369096
 US2008124180
 US2011020073
 WO2010096014
 JPH07237006
 JPH07227702
 JPS6346163Y
 WO2008066474
 US2006140728
 WO9305913
 WO2007145649