blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2590094

EP2590094 - Computer aided design model analysis system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.09.2021
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.10.2021  [2021/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bhaskara, Sreeram
11529 160th Court NE
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
 [2013/19]
Representative(s)Hylarides, Paul Jacques, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Hylarides, Paul Jacques, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date12191448.506.11.2012
[2013/19]
Priority number, dateUS20111329071507.11.2011         Original published format: US201113290715
[2013/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2590094
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2590094
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2017
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/50, G06N5/02
[2013/19]
CPC:
G06F30/00 (EP,US); G06F2111/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Computergestütztes Gestaltungsmodell-Analysesystem[2013/19]
English:Computer aided design model analysis system[2013/19]
French:Modèle de conception assistée par ordinateur d'un système d'analyse[2013/19]
Examination procedure13.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/19]
25.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
01.06.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/43]
22.06.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2021/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.202009   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - Sreeram Bhaskara, "Analysis and visualization of complex computer aided design models as a design structure matrix", (20110914), pages 14 - 15, The Boeing Company, URL: https://www.designsociety.org/download-publication/30824/analysis_and_visualization_of_complex_computer_aided_design_models_as_a_design_structure_matrix, (20170606), XP055378645 [X] 1-4,6-12,14,15 * page 61 * * page 64 - page 66 * * the whole document * [Y] 5,13
 [Y]  - Sreeram Bhaskara, "Re-engineering legacy knowledge based engineering systems using DSM", (20081111), The Boeing Company, URL: http://m.designsociety.org/download-publication/27445/re-engineering_legacy_knowledge_based_engineering_systems_using_dsm, (20170606), XP055378900 [Y] 5,13 * page 273 - page 275 * * the whole document *
 [A]  - TYSON R BROWNING, "Applying the Design Structure Matrix to System Decomposition and Integration Problems: A Review and New Directions", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENGINEERING MANAGEMENT, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (20010801), vol. 48, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9391, XP011019353 [A] 1-15 * page 292 - page 295 * * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.