Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2733238

EP2733238 - Surface treatment method, vessel and machine implementing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cyklos SA
c/o Froté & Partner
Rue de la Plaine 34
Case postale 538
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
[2015/01]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
Cyklos SA
Rue Galilée 15
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Turlot, Emmanuel
4 chemin de la Croix Montfleury
38700 Corenc / FR
02 / Voumard, Pierre
Chemin des Tailles 12
2016 Cortaillod / CH
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)BOVARD AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3013 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Bugnion Genève
Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10 Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
Application number, filing date12193002.816.11.2012
[2014/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2733238
Date:21.05.2014
Language:FR
[2014/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C25D17/00, C25D11/12, C25D17/08, C25D17/10, C25D21/10, C25D11/00, C25D5/08, C25D21/18, C25D17/12
[2014/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Oberflächenbehandlungsverfahren, entsprechender Kessel und entsprechende Maschine zur Umsetzung dieses Verfahrens[2014/21]
English:Surface treatment method, vessel and machine implementing the method[2014/21]
French:Procédé de traitement de surface, cuve et machine mettant en oeuvre le procédé[2014/21]
Examination procedure31.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
01.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/32]
15.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IDA]WO2010125515  (GOLDEN EAGLE TRADING LTD [MU], et al) [ID] 1-4 * page 15, line 18 - page 16, line 20 * * figure 3 * [A] 5-9,13-16;
 [AD]WO2008035199  (GOLDEN EAGLE TRADING LTD [MU], et al) [AD] 1-9,13-16 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2011186438  (SON CHI HO [KR]) [A] 1-9,13-16 * paragraphs [0012] , [0024] , [0028] , [0032] , [0039] , [0042] * * figures 3,4 *;
 [XAYI]US2093484  (MAX SCHLOTTER) [X] 5,13,14,16 * page 2, column right, line 15 - line 27 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 6-9,11,12 [Y] 10 [I] 15;
 [Y]JPH0243399  (NEC CORP) [Y] 10 * abstract *;
 [Y]GB191216475  (LEE GEORGE PHILIP MALCOLM, et al) [Y] 10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4964965  (NAKATSUGAWA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 10 * column 4, line 35 - line 45 *
by applicantDE2119401
 WO2006084973
 EP1433537
 WO2008035199
 WO2010125515