Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2596963

EP2596963 - Functionalized polymer, rubber composition with such a polymer and pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[2013/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Nebhani, Leena
3800 Fairway Park Drive, Apt. 212
Copley, OH Ohio 44321 / US
02 / Rachita, Michael Joseph
6404 Sylvian Street, N.W.
North Canton, OH Ohio 44720 / US
 [2013/22]
Representative(s)Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A.
Patent Department
Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[2014/27]
Former [2013/22]Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A. Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
Application number, filing date12193785.822.11.2012
[2013/22]
Priority number, dateUS20111330206622.11.2011         Original published format: US201113302066
[2013/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2596963
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2596963
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60C1/00, C08C19/20, C08C19/25, C08C19/44, C08F2/26, C08F36/06, C08F2/38
[2014/04]
Former International [2013/22]B60C1/00, C08C19/20, C08C19/25, C08C19/44, C08F2/26, C08F36/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/22]
TitleGerman:Funktionalisiertes Polymer, Gummizusammensetzung mit einem solchen Polymer, und pneumatischer Reifen[2013/22]
English:Functionalized polymer, rubber composition with such a polymer and pneumatic tire[2013/22]
French:Polymère fonctionnalisé, composition de caoutchouc avec un tel polymère et pneu[2013/22]
Examination procedure29.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/02]
23.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2014Fee for grant paid
23.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.03.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Trinseo Deutschland GmbH
Postfach 1265
06202 Merseburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2015/21]
Former [2015/20]
Opponent(s)01  31.03.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Trinseo Deutschland GmbH
Postfach 1265
06202 Merseburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Klusmann, Peter
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
DE-81925 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
08.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition06.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0354/17
13.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.11.2012
AL02.07.2014
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MK02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
SM02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
GB22.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU22.11.2012
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MK02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
SM02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
GB22.11.2016
Former [2018/01]HU22.11.2012
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
SM02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
GB22.11.2016
Former [2017/39]HU22.11.2012
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
SM02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/33]HU22.11.2012
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/32]HU22.11.2012
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
Former [2015/50]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RS02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/10]CZ02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT02.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1681293  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4301258  (LAL JOGINDER, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 6, lines 26-56; examples 1,2; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]US4301259  (LAL JOGINDER, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 6; examples 1-4 *;
 [A]EP2189464  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0020]; example 6; claims 1-15 *;
 [A]EP2090593  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]US2010184922  (KWAG GWANGHOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0032]; claims 1,4 *
by applicantUS4048420
 US4935471
 US6242534
 US6207757
 US6133364
 US6372857
 US5395891
 US6127488
 US5672639
 US2003130535
 US2008287601
    - D. RIVIN; J. ARON; A. MEDALIA, RUBBER CHEM. & TECHNOL., (1968), vol. 41, page 330
    - A. GESSLER; W. HESS; A MEDALIA, PLAST. RUBBER PROCESS, (1968), vol. 3, page 141
    - N. NAGATA, NIPPON GOMU KYOKAISHI, (1989), vol. 62, page 630
    - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1930), vol. 60, page 304
    - The Vanderbilt Rubber Handbook, (1978), pages 344 - 346