Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2736076

EP2736076 - Apparatus and method for manufacturing a layered product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.05.2015
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.06.2015  [2015/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / van Lammeren, Tim Johannes
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / Hendriks, Rob Jacob
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
03 / Rubingh, Eric
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
04 / Wouters, Jurgen Cornelis Hubertus
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
05 / Coenen, Erica Wilhelmina Catharina
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
06 / Abbel, Robert J.
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[2014/22]
Application number, filing date12194080.323.11.2012
[2014/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2736076
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/32, H05K3/28
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines geschichteten Produktes[2014/22]
English:Apparatus and method for manufacturing a layered product[2014/22]
French:Appareil et procédé de fabrication d'un produit stratifié[2014/22]
Examination procedure23.11.2012Examination requested  [2014/22]
29.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/25]
21.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/25]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IA]US4379833  (CANAVELLO BENJAMIN J, et al) [I] 6-9 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 34; figures 2.1-2.6 * [A] 1-5;
 [A]WO2010038181  (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 28; figures 2a,b *;
 [A]WO2012060260  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0014] - [0053]; figure 1 *
by applicantWO2012025847
 WO2010036116