Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2579666

EP2579666 - Allocation of access rights for a telecommunications channel to subscriber stations of a telecommunications network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/15]Telecommunication system with allocation of access rights for a telecommunications channel to subscriber stations of a telecommunications network
[2016/35]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPCom GmbH & Co. KG
Zugspitzstrasse 15
82049 Pullach / DE
[2013/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Fischer, Ralf
Langes Feld 3
31199 Diekholzen / DE
02 / Hans, Martin
Lavesring 10
31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE
03 / Kowalewski, Dr. Frank
Münchhausenstrasse 28
37085 Göttingen / DE
04 / Laumen, Josef
Galgenbachweg 25
85375 Neufahrn / DE
05 / Schmidt, Gunnar
Kapellenweg 15
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
06 / Lechner, Detlef
Rumeyplan 3
12101 Berlin-Tempelhof / DE
07 / Schulz, Holger
Arcostrasse 18
10587 Berlin / DE
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Molnia, David
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[2016/42]
Former [2013/15]Molnia, David
Fünf Höfe
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date12194487.015.02.2000
[2013/15]
Priority number, dateDE1999101023908.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910239
[2013/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2579666
Date:10.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2579666
Date:24.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2579666
Date:19.10.2016
Language:DE
[2016/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/10
[2013/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2016/42]
Former [2013/15]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Vergabe von Zugriffsrechten auf einen Telekommunikationskanal an Teilnehmerstationen eines Telekommunikationsnetzes[2016/35]
English:Allocation of access rights for a telecommunications channel to subscriber stations of a telecommunications network[2016/35]
French:Allocation de droits d'accès pour un canal de télécommunications à des stations d'utilisateur d'un réseau de télécommunications[2016/35]
Former [2013/15]Verfahren zur Vergabe von Zugriffsrechten auf einen Telekommunikationskanal an Teilnehmerstationen eines Telekommunikationsnetzes und Teilnehmerstation
Former [2013/15]Telecommunication system with allocation of access rights for a telecommunications channel to subscriber stations of a telecommunications network
Former [2013/15]Système de télécommunications pour l'allocation de droits d'accès pour un canal de télécommunications à des stations d'utilisateur d'un réseau de télécommunications
Examination procedure24.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/10]
31.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2015Observations by third parties
22.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2016Fee for grant paid
07.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00916749.5  / EP1186189
EP07009265.5  / EP1841268
EP10002773.9  / EP2200389
Divisional application(s)EP14177020.6  / EP2793524
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.07.2017  21.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  18.07.2017  21.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone GmbH
Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
 03  19.07.2017  25.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  19.07.2017  25.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23, Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/31]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2017  21.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  18.07.2017  21.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone GmbH
Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
 03  19.07.2017  25.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  19.07.2017  25.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23, Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2017/35]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2017  21.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  18.07.2017  21.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Vodafone GmbH
Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
 03  19.07.2017  25.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  19.07.2017   
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23, Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2017/34]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2017   
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  18.07.2017   
Vodafone GmbH
Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
 03  19.07.2017   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
23.08.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.03.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
14.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[A]US4707832  (GLENN RAYMOND R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 13 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 65 * * figures 1,13 *;
 [A]WO9719525  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 7 - line 17 * * page 3, line 3 - line 8 * * page 4, line 2 - line 20 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 26 * * figure 1 *
 [XY]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Mobile Station (MS) - Base Station System (BSS) interface; Radio Link Control/ Medium Access Control (RLC/MAC) protocol (GSM 04.60 version 6.2.0 Release 1997)", 3GPP STANDARD; GSM 04.60, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (19981001), no. V6.2.0, pages 1 - 181, XP050358536 [X] 1,11 * paragraph 7.1 paragraph 12.14 * [Y] 2-10,12
 [Y]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Service accessibility (GSM 02.11 version 6.0.0 Release 1997); TS 100 921", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (19980701), vol. 3-SA1;SMG1, no. V6.0.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014029296 [Y] 2-10,12 * paragraph 4. *
by applicantDE19838832
OppositionWO0054534
 EP1186189
 EP1841268
 EP2200389
 WO9719525
 WO9837668
 US4707832
 WO9115069
 WO9709836
 EP0765096
 DE19838832
 EP2579666
 EP1841268
    - "GLOBAL SYSTEM FOR MOBJLE COMMlJNICA TIONS (GSM) Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2); Mobile radio interface layer 3 specification (GSM 04.08 version 4.22.1)", ETSI-Standard GSM Standard 04.08, (19981000), pages 1 - 471, XP055403133
    - "Digital cellular telecommunications system {Phase 2+);General Packet Radio Service {GPRS);Mobile Station {MS) - Base Station System {BSS) interface;Radio Link Control/ Medium Access Control {RLC/MAC)protocol{GSM 04.60 version 6.2.0 Release 1997)", ETSI-Standard GSM 04.60, (19981000), pages 1 - 172, XP055403151
    - "technische Spezifikation TS 100 921", ETSI-Standard GSM 02.11, (19980700), pages 1 - 11, XP055403154
    - B. WALKE, "Mobilfunknetze und ihre Protokolle", Auszüge aus dem Lehrbuch, (19980000), vol. 2, ISBN 3-519-06431-6, XP002563270
    - J. EBERSPÄCHER et al., "Vermittlung, Dienste und Protokolle in digitalen Mobilfunknetzen", GSM Global System for Mobile Communication, (19970000), ISBN 3-519-06192-9, pages 1 - 5, XP055403158
    - J. EBERSPÄCHER et al., "Vermittlung, Dienste und Protokolle in digitalen Mobilfunknetzen", GSM Global System for Mobile Communication, (19990000), ISBN 3-519-06192-9, XP055403161
    - "UE-UTRAN Radio Interface Protocol Architecture", UMTS-Standards YY.01, (19981200), XP055403167
    - "Radio Equipment and Systems (RES); Trans-European Trunked Radio (TETRA); Voice plus Data (V+D); Part 2: Air Interface (Al)", Radio Equipment and Systems (RES), (19960300), XP055403171
    - "Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA); Security aspects; Subscriber Identity Module to Mobile Equipment (SIM - ME) interface", ETSI-Standard ETS 300 812, (19981100), pages 1 - 137, XP055403175
    - Tia/eia, "Mobile Station-Base Station Compatibility Standard for Dual-Mode Wideband Spread Spectrum Cellular System", TIA/EIA/IS-95,, (19930700), XP055348365
    - European Telecommunications Standards Institute (ETSI), "Radio Equipment and Systems (RES); Trans- European Trunked Radio (TETRA); Voice plus Data (V+D); Part 2: Air Interface (Al); ETS 300 392-2", IEEE, (19960300), XP014012877
    - "Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA); Security Aspects; Subscriber Identity Module to Mobile Equipment (SIM-ME) interface; ETS 300 812", IEEE, (19981100), XP014014596
    - EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, "Digital cellular telecommunications system ( phase 2+); General Packet Radio Service ( GPRS ); Mobile Station ( MS ) - Base Station System ( BSS ) interface; Radio Link Control / Medium Access Control ( RLC/MAC ) protocol", ETSI Standard GSM 04.60 V6.2.0 (1998-10), (19981000), pages 1 - 172, XP055403364
    - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Service accessibility (GSM 02.11 version 6.0.0 Release 1997); TS 100 921", IEEE,, (19980700), pages 1 - 11, XP014005690
    - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Mobile Station (MS) - Base Station System (BSS) interface; Radio Link Control/ Medium Access Control (RLC/MAC) protocol (GSM 04.60 version 6.2.0 Release 1997)", GSM 04.60 V6.2.0, (19981000), pages 1 - 172, XP002487502
    - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Mobile Station (MS) - Base Station System (BSS) interface; Radio Link Control / Medium Access Control (RLC/MAC) protocol (GSM 04.60 version 6.1.0 Release 1997)", Draft EN 301 349 V6.1.0, (19980800), XP050358526
    - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Service accessibility (GSM 02.11 version 6.0.0 Release 1997)", TS 100 921 V6.0.0, (19980700), XP050357484
    - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2); Mobile radio interface layer 3 specification (GSM 04.08 version 4.22.1)", ETSI Standard ETS 300 557, 11th ed, (19981000), pages 1 - 34, 180, 333-335, 461-471, XP055348369
    - "Mobile station-base station compability standard for dual-mode wideband spread spectrum cellular system", TIA/EIA/IS-95, (19930700), XP055348365
    - "UE-UTRAN Radio Interface Protocol Architecture, Stage 2", UMTS YY.01 - Tdoc SMG2 UMTS-L23, (19981200), pages 1 - 13, XP055348362
    - A. BRAND et al., Multiple Access Protocols for Mobile Communications GPRS, UMTS and Beyond, John Wiley & Sons, LTD, (20020000), pages 207 - 210, XP055402081
    - MICHEL MOULY et al., The GSM System for Mobile Communications, (19920000), pages 7-9, 11 - 15, 368-372, 427, XP055348156
    - J . L. SNELL, Introduction to Probability, McGraw-Hill, (19890000), pages v - xix , 7 - 11 , 114, XP055348146
    - D. E. KNUTH, The Art of Computer Programming, (19690000), vol. 2, pages 100 - 102, XP055348141
    - "Assignment of Access Overload Classes in the Cellular Telecommunications Services", TIA/EIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM BULLETIN TSB16, (19850300), XP055348138
    - "Proposal for RACH Access Control in UTRAN", ETSI UMTS L23 Expert Group Meeting - Tdoc SMG2 UMTS-L23 207 /98, (19980901), XP055402090
    - ETSI, "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+);General Packet Radio Service (GPRS);Mobile Station (MS) - Base Station System (BSS) interface;Radio Link Control/ Medium Access Control (RLC/MAC)protocol (GSM 04.60 version 6.2.0 Release 1997)", Excerpt from ETSI Standard GSM 04.60 , Version 6.2.0 (GSM 04.60, (19981000), XP055405618
    - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Service accessibility (GSM 02.11 version 6.0.0 Release 1997)", ETSI Standard GSM 02.11 , Version 6.0.0 (GSM 02.11), (19980700), XP055405664