blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2579666 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2579666



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 5375
06.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 47
06.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 47
06.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 47
06.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 47
02.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
02.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
02.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
02.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
01.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 126
01.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 126
01.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 126
01.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 125
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 14
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 36
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 20
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 67
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 48
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 32
31.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 54
30.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
30.07.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
24.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 4
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 6
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 5
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 5
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 5
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 5
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 6
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 4
24.07.2019 Claims Opposition 6
24.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 23
24.07.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
24.07.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
24.07.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
24.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
24.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
05.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2019 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
03.05.2019 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
26.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
26.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 20
17.01.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
29.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
29.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
29.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
29.06.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
21.06.2018 Request for a change of address - opponent Opposition 1
04.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.05.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
08.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.03.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 44
02.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.03.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 27
11.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.12.2017 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.10.2017 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
02.10.2017 Request for documents Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
22.09.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
22.09.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
22.09.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
22.09.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
22.09.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 92
28.08.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.08.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.08.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.08.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
31.07.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.07.2017 Request for documents Opposition 1
27.07.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.07.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
19.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 29
19.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
19.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
19.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
19.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
19.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
19.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
19.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
19.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
19.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.07.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.07.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.07.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.07.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 29
18.07.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 37
18.07.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 137
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 172
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 187
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 583
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 471
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
18.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 54
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 187
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 172
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
17.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
17.07.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 96
17.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
17.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
17.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
17.07.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
17.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
19.10.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.09.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
07.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.08.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.08.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.08.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
24.08.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
18.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
18.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
18.04.2016 Drawings Search / examination 3
18.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
22.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.05.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
08.05.2015 Annex Search / examination 8
08.05.2015 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Description Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
31.10.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.10.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.03.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 3
10.03.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 7
10.03.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 78
10.03.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 5
10.03.2014 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
11.02.2014 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
24.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.01.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.01.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
24.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
24.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.08.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.07.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.06.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 7
24.06.2013 European search report Search / examination 5
08.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.04.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.03.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
07.03.2013 Partial European search report Search / examination 5
18.02.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.02.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.11.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.11.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
27.11.2012 Description Search / examination 18
27.11.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Drawings Search / examination 3
27.11.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
22.09.2000 Priority document Search / examination 32