blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2579666


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.01.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
06.03.2018 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2017 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.08.2017 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
28.07.2017 Opposition filed published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Opposition filed published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
16.09.2016 (Expected) grant published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
09.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.09.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.09.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.08.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.07.2016 Change - German title published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
29.07.2016 Change - English title published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
29.07.2016 Change - French title published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
18.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.05.2015 New entry: Observations by third parties
04.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.10.2014 First examination report
18.07.2014 Change - divisional application(s) published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
11.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2014 Amendment by applicant
31.01.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
31.01.2014 Change - designated states published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
21.06.2013 Publication of search report published on  24.07.2013  [2013/30]
21.06.2013 Change - classification published on  24.07.2013  [2013/30]
09.04.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
18.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid