Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2600213

EP2600213 - Method of forming a synthetic hologram in a raster image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT À L'ÉNERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ÉNERGIES ALTERNATIVES
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/23]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES ALTERNATIVES
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MARTINEZ, Christophe
2, Rue Sidi Brahim
38100 GRENOBLE / FR
 [2013/23]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Beaumont
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2013/23]
Application number, filing date12194551.328.11.2012
[2013/23]
Priority number, dateFR2011006091529.11.2011         Original published format: FR 1160915
[2013/23]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2600213
Date:05.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2600213
Date:14.05.2014
Language:FR
[2014/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:G03H1/00, // G03H1/08
[2013/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erstellung eines synthetischen Hologramms in einem Rasterbild[2013/23]
English:Method of forming a synthetic hologram in a raster image[2013/23]
French:Procédé de formation d'un hologramme synthétique dans une image tramée[2013/23]
Examination procedure26.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/32]
09.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2014Fee for grant paid
03.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2013
Opposition(s)17.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.11.2012
AL14.05.2014
AT14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MK14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE28.11.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU28.11.2012
AT14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MK14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE28.11.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2017/39]HU28.11.2012
AT14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE28.11.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2016/33]HU28.11.2012
AT14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE28.11.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU28.11.2012
AT14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE28.11.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2016/31]AT14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE28.11.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE28.11.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2014/52]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY14.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005093856  (BORGSMULLER STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - ROSEN J ET AL, "HIDDEN IMAGES IN HALFTONE PICTURES", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20010710), vol. 40, no. 20, doi:10.1364/AO.40.003346, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 3346 - 3353, XP001081102 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.40.003346
by applicant   - JOSEPH ROSEN; BAHRAM JAVIDI, "Hidden images in halftone pictures", APPL. OPT., vol. 40, no. 20, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.40.003346, pages 3346 - 3353, XP001081102

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.40.003346
    - "A pratical algorithm for the determination of the phase from image and diffraction plane pictures", OPTIK, vol. 35, pages 237 - 246