Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2620326

EP2620326 - Method and device for supporting a coupling procedure of a trailer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.07.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2013/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Niemz, Volker
Uhlandstrasse1
71277 Rutesheim / DE
 [2013/31]
Application number, filing date12194949.930.11.2012
[2013/31]
Priority number, dateDE20121020094624.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012200946
[2013/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2620326
Date:31.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2620326
Date:01.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/00
[2013/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/31]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Unterstützen eines Ankuppelns eines Anhängers[2013/31]
English:Method and device for supporting a coupling procedure of a trailer[2013/31]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'assistance d'accouplement d'une remorque[2013/31]
Examination procedure26.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/11]
08.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2015Fee for grant paid
17.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.12.2015   
Connaught Electronics Ltd.
Dunmore Road
Tuam, County Galway / IE
Opponent's representative
Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstraße 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
 [2016/03]
03.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
31.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2265/17
24.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2012
AL01.04.2015
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MK01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
SM01.04.2015
TR01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
IE30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
LU30.11.2015
AT30.11.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2018/46]HU30.11.2012
AL01.04.2015
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MK01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
SM01.04.2015
TR01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
IE30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
LU30.11.2015
Former [2018/31]HU30.11.2012
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MK01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
SM01.04.2015
TR01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
IE30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
LU30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU30.11.2012
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
SM01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
IE30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
LU30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
CH30.11.2015
IE30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
LU30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
LU30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
LU30.11.2015
Former [2016/28]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/09]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/07]CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
PT03.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1251025  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0009] , [0010] , [0019] - [0024] - [0033] - [0049] * * figure - * [Y] 3,6,8,9;
 [X]EP1377062  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7,10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0029] - [0032] - [0041] * * figure - *;
 [X]EP1249365  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0009] - [0021] - [0023] - [0040] - [0046] * * figure - *;
 [Y]GB2447672  (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [Y] 3,6,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 22 * * page 2, line 17 - line 20 * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 9 * * page 13, line 4 - page 16, line 17 * * figure - *;
 [Y]US2009271078  (DICKINSON MIKE [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0019] - [0034] * * figure - *
OppositionDE102008013457
 EP1251025
 EP1377062
 EP1249365
 DE102008039136
 DE102004029129
 DE4336288