EP2599687 - Vehicle steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayama, Ryouhei c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/23] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12194988.7 | 30.11.2012 | [2013/23] | Priority number, date | JP20110262348 | 30.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011262348 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2599687 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2599687 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2599687 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/00, B62D5/04 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
B62D5/001 (EP,US);
B62D6/00 (US);
B62D5/046 (EP,US);
B62D5/049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2013/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeuglenkungssystem | [2013/23] | English: | Vehicle steering system | [2013/23] | French: | Système de direction de véhicule | [2013/23] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2012 | AL | 20.01.2016 | AT | 20.01.2016 | BE | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10038167 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007118823 (NSK LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1839995 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2010178546 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2011015594 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1* abstract * |