Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2738094

EP2738094 - SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CABIN LAYOUT IN A CABIN OF A VEHICLE AND TO AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/23]System and a method for determining a cabin layout in a cabin of a vehicle and to an aircraft
[2019/47]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2019/48]
Former [2014/23]For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Hans-Achim
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
02 / Zybala, Andre
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
03 / Rathge, Christian
c/o Inst. Automation & Kommunikation e.V. Magdeburg
Werner-Heisenberg-Strasse 1
39106 Magdeburg / DE
04 / Koker, Christian
c/o Inst. Automation & Kommunikation e.V. Magdeburg
Werner-Heisenberg-Strasse 1
39106 Magdeburg / DE
05 / Gunnar, Jonas
c/o Inst. Automation & Kommunikation e.V. Magdeburg
Werner-Heisenberg-Strasse 1
39106 Magdeburg / DE
 [2019/44]
Former [2014/23]01 / Bauer, Hans-Achim
Elversweg 79A
21037 Hamburg / DE
02 / Zybala, Andre
Am Pellerbruch 16
21271 Hanstedt / DE
03 / Rathge, Christian
Gang 4
39167 Irxleben / DE
04 / Koker, Christian
Lindenstr. 7
39517 Mahlwinkel / DE
05 / Gunnar, Jonas
Freiligrathstr. 6
18055 Rostock / DE
Representative(s)LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
[2019/48]
Former [2014/23]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Engineering
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12195059.630.11.2012
[2014/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2738094
Date:04.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2738094
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B64D11/06, G01D5/20, B60R16/03, H02J50/00, // B64D11/00
[2019/20]
Former International [2014/23]B64D11/06, G01D5/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2014/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES KABINENLAYOUTS IN EINER FAHRZEUGKABINE ODER IN EINEM FLUGZEUG[2019/47]
English:SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CABIN LAYOUT IN A CABIN OF A VEHICLE AND TO AN AIRCRAFT[2019/47]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE TOPOLOGIE DE CABINE DANS UNE CABINE DE VÉHICULE ET UN AÉRONEF[2019/47]
Former [2014/23]System und Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines Kabinenlayouts in einer Fahrzeugkabine oder in einem Flugzeug
Former [2014/23]System and a method for determining a cabin layout in a cabin of a vehicle and to an aircraft
Former [2014/23]Système et procédé permettant de déterminer une topologie de cabine dans une cabine de véhicule et un aéronef
Examination procedure07.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
20.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.09.2019Fee for grant paid
19.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.10.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
11.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO2011073063  (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,5-10,12,13 * page 1, lines 11-14 * * page 2, line 8 - page 8, line 24 * * page 9, line 8 - page 12, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB2327914  (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [A] 1,12 * pages 1-5,7-18 * * figures 1-8 *
by applicantWO2012085097
 WO2011073063