EP2604221 - Fibrotic band interrupter and implant introducing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Insightra Medical, Inc. 9200 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 200 Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noda, Wayne A. 28072 Paso Rincon Mission Viejo California, California 92692 / US | 02 /
Adzich, Vaso 19102 Kassy Drive Santa Ana California, California 92705 / US | 03 /
Bell, Stephen Graham Via Simone Martini 136 EUR 00142 Roma / IT | 04 /
Amato, Giuseppe Rapisardi 66 90144 Palermo / IT | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Schütte, Gearoid, et al Cruickshank 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Schütte, Gearoid, et al Cruickshank & Company 8A Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12195330.1 | 03.12.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | US201113326696 | 15.12.2011 Original published format: US201113326696 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2604221 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0072 (EP,US);
A61M2005/31508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fibrotischer Bandunterbrecher und Implantateinführungsvorrichtung | [2013/25] | English: | Fibrotic band interrupter and implant introducing device | [2013/25] | French: | Interrupteur de bande fibreuse et dispositif d'introduction d'implant | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 31.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US20070934897 |