Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2604873

EP2604873 - Main bearing for crankshaft for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/25]Main bearing for crankshaft of internal combustion engine
[2015/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.05.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daido Metal Company Ltd.
13F Nagoya Hirokoji Bldg. 3-1 Sakae 2-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya / JP
[2013/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Ishigo, Osamu
c/o DAIDO METAL COMPANY LTD.
Maehara Aza Tendoshinden
Inuyama-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Tomita, Yuichi
c/o DAIDO METAL COMPANY LTD.
Maehara Aza Tendoshinden
Inuyama-shi, Aichi / JP
03 / Yamada, Motohira
c/o DAIDO METAL COMPANY LTD.
Maehara Aza Tendoshinden
Inuyama-shi, Aichi / JP
 [2013/25]
Representative(s)Beckmann, Claus
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2015/26]
Former [2013/25]Beckmann, Claus
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date12196480.311.12.2012
[2013/25]
Priority number, dateJP2011027583316.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011275833
[2013/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2604873
Date:19.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2604873
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16C9/02, F16C33/10, F16C17/02
[2013/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/25]
TitleGerman:Hauptlager für die Kurbelwelle eines Verbrennungsmotors[2013/25]
English:Main bearing for crankshaft for internal combustion engine[2015/04]
French:Palier principal pour vilebrequin de moteur à combustion interne[2013/25]
Former [2013/25]Main bearing for crankshaft of internal combustion engine
Examination procedure11.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/25]
18.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2015Fee for grant paid
11.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.01.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.03.2016  04.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/19]
Former [2016/17]
Opponent(s)01  23.03.2016   
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
03.05.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0187/18
29.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2012
AL24.06.2015
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU11.12.2012
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU11.12.2012
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/03]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2011104940  (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-7 *;
 [AD]EP2078875  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-44 *;
 [A]US2009257695  (UKAI TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US2010316312  (MAITANI SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US2011058761  (ISHIGO OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2011058762  (ISHIGO OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-18 *;
 [A]JP2011085260  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1510709  (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1-8 *
by applicantJPS61573U
 JPS61573Y
 JPH04219521
 JP2005249024
 JP2011179572
 JP2008095858
OppositionDE102005009470
 EP2078875
 DE102008008584
 EP1557544
 JP2011179572
 EP2541080
 EP1510709
 EP2604873
    - "Fragen zu Maßen der Kurbelwelle MKB AAA- ETKA Teile Nr. 021 105 101 L", Motor Talk, (20120207), URL: http://www.motor-talk.de/forum/fragen-zu-massen-der-kurbelwelle-mkb-aaa-etka-teile-nr-021-105-101-l-t3745663.html, XP055277554
    - "VW Käfer Motor-Toleranzen", GW-Autoteile, (20160000), URL: http://www.gw-autoteile.de/Service/Kaefer07.htm, XP055277557
    - Uwe Reuter, "Pleuel", flat4, (19991110), URL: www.flat4.de, XP055277593