Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2713302

EP2713302 - System and method for countering detection of emulation by malware [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2016
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK, PT
published on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
[2014/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Belov, Sergey Y.
c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO
10 Geroyev Panfilovtsev Street
125363 Moscow / RU
 [2014/14]
Representative(s)Sloboshanin, Sergej , et al
V. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Hano Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
[2014/14]
Application number, filing date12196850.713.12.2012
[2014/14]
Priority number, dateRU2012014148028.09.2012         Original published format: RU 2012141480
[2014/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2713302
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2713302
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56
[2014/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/17]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Abwehr der Erfassung einer Emulation durch Schadsoftware[2015/02]
English:System and method for countering detection of emulation by malware[2014/14]
French:Système et procédé permettant de contrer la détection d'une émulation par un logiciel malveillant[2015/08]
Former [2014/14]System und Verfahren zur Emulationsabwehrerkennung durch ein Schadprogramm
Former [2014/14]Système et procédé permettant de contrer l'émulation par détection de logiciel malveillant
Examination procedure13.12.2012Examination requested  [2014/14]
11.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2014Fee for grant paid
20.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2014
Opposition(s)26.11.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.12.2012
AT25.02.2015
BE25.02.2015
BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
IT25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
MK25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
PT25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
SM25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
[2018/31]
Former [2017/39]HU13.12.2012
AT25.02.2015
BE25.02.2015
BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
IT25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
SM25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2016/33]AT25.02.2015
BE25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
IT25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2016/24]AT25.02.2015
BE25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
IT25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2016/12]AT25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
IT25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2016/03]AT25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
IT25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/50]AT25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/49]AT25.02.2015
CZ25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/41]AT25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/39]AT25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/38]AT25.02.2015
ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/37]ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
Former [2015/36]ES25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
Former [2015/35]ES25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
Former [2015/33]ES25.02.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010132038  (ZAITSEV OLEG V [RU]) [X] 1,6,13 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,7-12;
 [A]US2010180344  (MALYSHEV ALEXEY [RU], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7603713
 US2011225655