Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2743681

EP2743681 - Fluorescence detector system for detection of an aromatic hydrocarbon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Arias Espinoza, Juan Diego
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / Smits, Edsger Constant Pieter
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[2014/25]
Application number, filing date12196960.413.12.2012
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2743681
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G01N21/77
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Fluoreszenzdetektorsystem zur Detektion eines aromatischen Kohlenwasserstoffs[2014/25]
English:Fluorescence detector system for detection of an aromatic hydrocarbon[2014/25]
French:Système de détecteur de fluorescence pour la détection d'un hydrocarbure aromatique[2014/25]
Examination procedure13.12.2012Examination requested  [2014/25]
19.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/26]
27.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IY]  - SAZHNIKOV V A ET AL, "Silica nanoparticles with covalently attached fluorophore as selective analyte-responsive supramolecular chemoreceptors", NANOTECHNOLOGIES IN RUSSIA, SP MAIK NAUKA/INTERPERIODICA, DORDRECHT, (20120307), vol. 7, no. 1 - 2, doi:10.1134/S1995078012010144, ISSN 1995-0799, pages 6 - 14, XP035025486 [I] 1,2,6,8,10,11 * Section: Introduction * * page 8, column l, paragraph last * * Section: Results and Discussion; page 8 - page 11 * [Y] 3-5,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S1995078012010144
 [IY]  - THANH-TOAN TRUONG ET AL, "Exciplexes or ground state complexes of (dibenzoylmethanato)boron difluoride and benzene derivatives? A study of their optical properties revisited via liquid state investigations and structure calculations", PHOTOCHEMICAL & PHOTOBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20060101), vol. 5, no. 7, doi:10.1039/b600710b, ISSN 1474-905X, page 686, XP055059954 [I] 1,2,6,8,10,11 * Sections 1, 2.3, 3.1 * [Y] 3-5,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b600710b
 [Y]  - PIERRE VALAT ET AL, "Unusually strong emission from an exciplex formed between benzenoid solvents and dibenzoylmethanatoboron difluoride. Formation of a triplex", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (19951101), vol. 73, no. 11, doi:10.1139/v95-235, ISSN 0008-4042, pages 1902 - 1913, XP055059953 [Y] 3-5,7 * page 1904 - page 1905 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/v95-235
 [A]  - ATSUSHI SAKAI ET AL, "White light emission from a single component system: remarkable concentration effects on the fluorescence of 1,3-diaroylmethanatoboron difluoride", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 53, no. 32, doi:10.1016/J.TETLET.2012.05.122, ISSN 0040-4039, (20120525), pages 4138 - 4141, (20120530), XP028400889 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2012.05.122
 [A]  - YUAN L. CHOW ET AL, "Molecular interactions of dibenzoylmethanatoboron difluoride (DBMBF2) in the excited and ground states in solution", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY A: CHEMISTRY, (19910401), vol. 57, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/1010-6030(91)85020-H, ISSN 1010-6030, pages 247 - 255, XP055059952 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1010-6030(91)85020-H
by applicantEP1712889
 US2006051826
 WO2005015173
    - PROC OF SPIE, vol. 8439
    - JAN ROMAN PAUL; DETLEV FRITSCH; THOMAS KLASSEN; KLAUS-VIKTOR PEINEMANN, JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 389, page 343
    - SEO; HILLMYER, SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 336, pages 1422 - 1425
    - SAZSHNIKOV, NANOTECHNOLOGIES IN RUSSIA, vol. 7, no. 1-2, pages 6 - 14
    - TORRACA ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 122, no. 51, pages 12907 - 12908
    - MYUNGEUN SEO; MARC A. HILLMYER, SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 336, page 1422
    - JAZID RZAYEV; MARC A HILLMYER, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2005), vol. 127, page 13373