Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2609951 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2609951



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 120
14.12.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
14.12.2012 Drawings Search / examination 5
14.12.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2012 Description Search / examination 11
14.12.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
14.12.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.12.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
25.02.2013 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.07.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
19.12.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.12.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
11.11.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.11.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.02.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Annex Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.03.2016 Deficiencies in request for rectification in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.04.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 2
06.05.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.06.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1