blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2609951 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2609951



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 120
05.04.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.05.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.04.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 2
21.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Deficiencies in request for rectification in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Annex Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.11.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
14.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.12.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
19.12.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.07.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.06.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
25.02.2013 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
18.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
14.12.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.12.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.12.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
14.12.2012 Description Search / examination 11
14.12.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2012 Drawings Search / examination 5
14.12.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4