blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2609951


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
07.04.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
29.04.2016 (Expected) grant published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.04.2016 Change - inventor published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
23.02.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.11.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.01.2014 Amendment by applicant
03.01.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.02.2014  [2014/06]
03.01.2014 Change - designated states published on  05.02.2014  [2014/06]
02.07.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.07.2013  [2013/27]