blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2609951
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8740858Global Dossier 03.06.2014B2
US2013165853 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011283255 26.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5936859BGlobal Dossier 22.06.2016B2
JP2013132349 08.07.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2011283255 26.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2609951Global Dossier 01.06.2016B1
EP2609951 03.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011283255 26.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK2609951T 29.08.2016T3
Priority number Date
JP2011283255 26.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2587629T 25.10.2016T3
Priority number Date
JP2011283255 26.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE029882T 28.04.2017T2
Priority number Date
JP2011283255 26.12.2011