Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2609951

EP2609951 - A syringe kit for mixing two medicinal chemicals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daikyo Seiko, LTD.
38-2, Sumida 3-chome Sumida-ku
Tokyo 131-0031 / JP
[2013/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Kawamura, Hideaki
c/o DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD.
38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 131-0031 / JP
 [2016/21]
Former [2013/27]01 / Kawachi, Yasushi
c/o DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD.
38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 131-0031 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2013/27]
Application number, filing date12197225.114.12.2012
[2013/27]
Priority number, dateJP2011028325526.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011283255
[2013/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2609951
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2609951
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/178, A61M5/34
[2013/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/22]
Former [2013/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spritzenkit zum Mischen von zwei medizinischen Chemikalien[2013/27]
English:A syringe kit for mixing two medicinal chemicals[2013/27]
French:Kit de seringue de mélange de deux composés chimiques médicinaux[2013/27]
Examination procedure19.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/06]
11.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2016Fee for grant paid
19.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.11.2015
Opposition(s)02.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
Former [2018/38]BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
LU14.12.2016
Former [2018/29]CY01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
LU14.12.2016
Former [2017/49]EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
LU14.12.2016
Former [2017/47]EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/37]EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/11]EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/10]EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
Former [2016/52]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
Former [2016/49]FI01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
Former [2016/46]LT01.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2001037091  (WIRONEN JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 41]; figures 8, 9 *;
 [A]EP1080742  (BRACCO INT BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 9]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5851201  (RITGER PHILIP L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 35 - line 56 * * figures 1-3; claim 3 *;
 [A]US2010280462  (KOMMIREDDY DINESH [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2009177186  (DELANO PETER [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 *
by applicantJP2003518411