Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2745744

EP2745744 - Backfolded pocket mattress [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starsprings AB
P.O. Box 44
524 21 Herrljunga / SE
[2017/03]
Former [2014/26]For all designated states
Stjernfjädrar AB
P.O. Box 44
524 21 Herrljunga / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Ahlqvist, Robert
Pl 1510
447 90 Vårgårda / SE
 [2014/26]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date12198084.119.12.2012
[2014/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2745744
Date:25.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2745744
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A47C27/06, A47C27/07
[2014/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/26]
TitleGerman:Umgeschlagene Taschenmatratze[2014/26]
English:Backfolded pocket mattress[2014/26]
French:Matelas de poche replié sur lui-même[2014/26]
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
13.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2015Fee for grant paid
29.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.10.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.12.2015  16.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Spühl GmbH
Grüntalstrasse 23
9300 Wittenbach / CH
Opponent's representative
Banzer, Hans-Jörg
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 [2016/03]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.11.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0314/18
03.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
14.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2012
AL11.03.2015
AT11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MK11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
MT08.07.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU19.12.2012
AT11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MK11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
MT08.07.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU19.12.2012
AT11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
MT08.07.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
LU19.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2016/12]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/51]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ11.03.2015
ES11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/39]ES11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
Former [2015/33]ES11.03.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005055771  (STJERNFJAEDRAR AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,7,11 * figure 3 * * page 4, lines 32-36 *;
 [A]FR2932658  (CIE CONTINENTALE SIMMONS [FR]) [A] 1,7,11 * figure 4 * * page 7, lines 5-30 *;
 [A]US1382462  (BILLS E.S. [US]) [A] 1,7,11 * figures 3,4 * * page 1, lines 70-92 *
OppositionWO2005055771
 WO0102747
 US6499275
 US4854023
 US1915957
 US1995641
 US2113457
    - "Betriebshandbuch Federwindemaschine PWS-100", REMEX AG, Version 1.1 DE, pages 1 - 143, XP055267341
    - "Operating Instructions PWS-100", REMEX AG, Version 1.1 EN, XP055267343
    - Bild des Endprodukts: Federkern mit ''eingeklappten Ohren
    - "Produktprospekt Gesamtanlage PST-200 (inkl. Federwindemaschine PWS- 100", REMEX AG