Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2749696

EP2749696 - Roadway section including an expansion joint device with an exchangeable cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Koopman, Arnold
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / van Vliet, Dave
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[2014/27]
Application number, filing date12199747.228.12.2012
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2749696
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:E01D19/06
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Fahrbahnabschnitt mit einer Verlängerungsstückvorrichtung mit austauschbarer Patrone[2014/27]
English:Roadway section including an expansion joint device with an exchangeable cartridge[2014/27]
French:Section de route comprenant un dispositif de joint d'expansion avec une cartouche interchangeable[2014/27]
Examination procedure28.12.2012Examination requested  [2014/27]
06.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/36]
11.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2003213611  (ARAI MOTONOSUKE; ARAI YOSHIMASA) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-12 * abstract * * figures 1-10 * [I] 4,8;
 [A]US2002138925  (CHANG MING-HUANG [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-8 *