Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2743817

EP2743817 - Touch screen device for handling lists [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Telecommunications public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2014/25]
Representative(s)Cardus, Alan Peter
BT Intellectual Property Department
Ground Floor
BT Faraday Building
1 Knightrider Street
London EC4V 5BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]Cardus, Alan Peter
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date12250179.412.12.2012
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2743817
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Berührungsempfindliches Display[2014/25]
English:Touch screen device for handling lists[2014/25]
French:Affichage sensible au toucher[2014/25]
Examination procedure12.12.2012Examination requested  [2014/25]
26.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2016/27]
06.10.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201403   M06   Not yet paid
31.12.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010162179  (PORAT OFRI OLAVI [FI]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045]; figure 3 *;
 [X]EP1983416  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040]; figure 3 *;
 [X]US2010295805  (SHIN HYUN KYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,12-16,18 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0045] *;
 [X]US2010298034  (SHIN HYUN KYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,9,10,12,13 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060]; figure 2 *;
 [X]US2012188174  (MIGOS CHARLES J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10-13 * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0210]; figures 5E,5K,5L *;
 [X]WO2008086319  (APPLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-16 * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0155]; figure 6J *;
 [A]US2012030566  (VICTOR B MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0090] *