Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2690548

EP2690548 - Computer architecture with a hardware accumulator reset [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2018New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd.
13 Hartom Street
P.O.B. 45157, Har Hotzvim
Jerusalem 9777513 / IL
[2014/51]
Former [2014/05]For all designated states
Mobileye Technologies Ltd
7 Florinis Street
Nicosia / CY
Inventor(s)01 / Dogon, Gil Israel
1 Habeer Street
95746 Jersalem / IL
02 / Arbeli, Yosi
20 Tabib Street
7532020 Rishon-Le-Zion / IL
03 / Kreinin, Yosef
68/22 Ben Zakkai Street
93585 Jerusalem / IL
 [2014/05]
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[2014/05]
Application number, filing date12275113.426.07.2012
[2014/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2690548
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/32, G06F9/30, G06F15/80
[2014/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Computerarchitektur mit einem Hardware-Akkumulator-Reset[2014/05]
English:Computer architecture with a hardware accumulator reset[2014/05]
French:Architecture informatique avec une réinitialisation matérielle de l'accumulateur[2014/05]
Examination procedure29.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
22.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.08.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XAI]GB2382672  (ALPHAMOSAIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * page 3, 2nd and 3rd paragraph * * page 4, paragraph l * * page 8, lines 20-22 * * page 11, lines 19-26 * * page 13, lines 18-22 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 3,4,6,7,11-15 [I] 10;
 [X]GB2464292  (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]) [X] 1,8 * page 23, lines 25-29 *;
 [A]  - NIKOLAOS KAVVADIAS ET AL, "Elimination of Overhead Operations in Complex Loop Structures for Embedded Microprocessors", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20080201), vol. 56, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9340, pages 200 - 214, XP011194980 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *