Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2514733

EP2514733 - Improved method for the treatment of buildings and grounds by applying an electric field [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2014
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chasteau, François
4, Rue des Lilas d'Espagne
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2012/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)Andrieux, Benoît
IFP Energies nouvelles
Département Propriété Industrielle
1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Andrieux, Benoît
IFP Energies nouvelles 1 et 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12290134.117.04.2012
[2012/43]
Priority number, dateFR2011000126821.04.2011         Original published format: FR 1101268
[2012/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2514733
Date:24.10.2012
Language:FR
[2012/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2514733
Date:29.01.2014
Language:FR
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:C04B41/45
[2012/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/43]
TitleGerman:Verbessertes Verfahren zur Behandlung von Bauten und Böden durch Anlegen eines elektrischen Feldes[2012/43]
English:Improved method for the treatment of buildings and grounds by applying an electric field[2012/43]
French:Procédé amélioré pour le traitement de constructions et de terrains par application d'un champs électrique[2012/43]
Examination procedure16.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/23]
12.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2013Fee for grant paid
17.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2013
Opposition(s)30.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.04.2012
AL29.01.2014
AT29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MK29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU17.04.2012
AT29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MK29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/33]HU17.04.2012
AT29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/32]HU17.04.2012
AT29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/31]AT29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/29]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/22]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/16]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2015/24]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE17.04.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2015/01]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
LU17.04.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/52]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
RS29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2006125878  (CHASTEAU FRANCOIS [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * claim - *
by applicantWO0233147
 WO0233148
 WO2006125878