Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2632136

EP2632136 - A method, a system, a server, a device for configuring a device near a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2014
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2014  [2014/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2014/34]
Former [2013/35]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Denhez, Alain
3 rue Fronval
78140 Velizy / FR
 [2013/35]
Representative(s)Kleinbub, Oliver , et al
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2013/35]
Application number, filing date12305226.827.02.2012
[2013/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2632136
Date:28.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725
[2013/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren, System, Server, Vorrichtung zur Konfiguration einer Vorrichtung in Fahrzeugnähe[2013/35]
English:A method, a system, a server, a device for configuring a device near a vehicle[2013/35]
French:Procédé, système, serveur, dispositif de configuration d'un dispositif à proximité d'un véhicule[2013/35]
Examination procedure01.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/37]
08.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2010129939  (OBDEDGE LLC [US]; GUBA ROBERT WILLIAM [US]; POWERS DONALD L [US]; BROW) [X] 1,3-6,8,10-13 * abstract * * page 4, lines 10-23 * * page 15, line 8 - page 24, line 15 * * page 26, line 10 - page 28, line 15 * * page 32, line 28 * * page 40, line 26 - page 41, line 2 * * figures 1-3,17 * [I] 2,7,9;
 [XI]US2010210254  (KELLY CHARLES [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-6,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0047] - [0051] - [0057] , [0058] , [0064] - [0075] * * figures 1,4 * [I] 2,7-9;
 [A]US2011207449  (SHIN HYUN SOON [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0071] - [0075] * * figures 2,5A,5C *;
 [A]US2011298924  (MILLER THOMAS LEE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0026] , [0027] * * figure 1 *