Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2510904

EP2510904 - Intervertebral cage for fusion. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Osteal Medical
69 rue de la Belle Etoile
Paris Nord II
95957 Roissy Aeroport CDG / FR
[2012/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Morvan, Stéphane
12 Impasse Marie de Sormiou
13008 MARSEILLE / FR
 [2012/42]
Representative(s)Kohler, Pierre
CAPRI
33, rue de Naples
75008 Paris / FR
[2015/35]
Former [2012/42]Kohler, Pierre
CAPRI 33, rue de Naples
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12305411.606.04.2012
[2012/42]
Priority number, dateFR2011005312111.04.2011         Original published format: FR 1153121
[2012/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2510904
Date:17.10.2012
Language:FR
[2012/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2510904
Date:26.08.2015
Language:FR
[2015/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44
[2012/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/35]
Former [2012/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bandscheibengerüst für die Fusion[2012/42]
English:Intervertebral cage for fusion.[2012/42]
French:Cage intervertebrale pour la fusion[2012/42]
Examination procedure16.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/21]
23.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2015Fee for grant paid
20.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2015
Opposition(s)30.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.04.2012
AL26.08.2015
AT26.08.2015
BG26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
MT26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
TR26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
IE06.04.2016
LU06.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU06.04.2012
AT26.08.2015
BG26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
MT26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
TR26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
IE06.04.2016
LU06.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2018/31]HU06.04.2012
AT26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
MT26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
TR26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
IE06.04.2016
LU06.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2018/29]HU06.04.2012
AT26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
TR26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
IE06.04.2016
LU06.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU06.04.2012
AT26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
IE06.04.2016
LU06.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/38]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
IE06.04.2016
LU06.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/07]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
LU06.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
LU06.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/14]AT26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT26.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102005004563  (ADVANCED MED TECH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0061]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0880950  (BIOMAT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure 8 *;
 [A]US2006253201  (MCLUEN GARY R [US]) [A] 1-4,6-8 * column 0044 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] *;
 [A]US2005131536  (EISERMANN LUKAS [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]US2006247770  (PETERMAN MARC M [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0070] *;
 [A]WO02076335  (MICHELSON GARY K [US]) [A] 1 * page 22, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US6217579  (KOROS TIBOR [US]) [A] 1,9-12 * page 3, line 33 - line 38; figure 5 *;
 [A]US6159244  (SUDDABY LOUBERT [US]) [A] 9-12 * column 3, line 34; figure 5 *
by applicantFR2914180